Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Los Angeles Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) 42-Cv Other Complaint - Civil Unlimited case represented by Anaya, Alana B, against California Housing Finance Agency, A Public Instrumentality, O'Keefe, Charlene A., Paul, Michelle Lee, U.S. Bank National Association, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management187 days |
Filing DateMay 29, 2019 |
Category42-Cv Other Complaint - Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
||
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: November 24, 2020Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: December 02, 2019Order to Show Cause
Date: May 30, 2019Ruling
Date: August 23, 2019Ruling
Date: September 30, 2019Ruling
Date: September 25, 2020Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: December 09, 2020Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: May 06, 2021Further Case Management Conference
Date: May 06, 2021Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: July 28, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: December 09, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 24, 2019Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 22, 2019Further Case Management Conference
Date: January 30, 2020Further Case Management Conference
Date: July 28, 2020Ruling
Date: November 30, 2021Further Case Management Conference
Date: February 07, 2022Further Case Management Conference
Date: August 05, 2021Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: February 07, 2022PAUL DISM
Date: March 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2022 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) re: Imposition of Sanctions in the amount of $250.00 as to plaintiff counsel for FTA on 02/07/22 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
March 10, 2022 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 cont'd from 02/7/22 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
March 10, 2022 | Hearing |
Further Case Management Conference cont'td from 05/06/21 and 08/05/21, 02/07/22 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 cont'd from 02/7/22 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) re: Imposition of Sanctions in the amount of $250.00 as to plaintiff counsel for FTA on 02/07/22 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference cont'td from 05/06/21 and 08/05/21, 02/07/22 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PAUL DISM | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference/Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 02/07/2022 Further Case Management Conference cont'td from 05/06/21 and 08/05/21 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference/Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 02/07/2022 Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 c/c with cmc Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
February 07, 2022 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.