Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Caples, Samantha L., Madden, Sarah A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Korper, Rene, against Bakersfield Dodge, Inc. Dba Haddad Dodge Kia, Haddad Kia, An Unknown Business Entity, Kia Motors America, Inc., represented by Jo, Stefanie G., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management181 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2019 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial595 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order to Show Cause
Date: January 23, 2019Jury Trial
Date: February 01, 2021Motion to Tax Costs
Date: April 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2021 | Hearing |
Ruling
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Tax Costs 04/09/2021 Motion to Tax Costs 03/19/21 Plaintiffs, SARAH A. MADDEN; SAMANTHA L CAPLES Re-Notice Motion to Tax or Strike Defendants' Memorandum of Costs Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 09, 2021 | Hearing |
Motion to Tax Costs 03/19/21 Plaintiffs, SARAH A. MADDEN; SAMANTHA L CAPLES Re-Notice Motion to Tax or Strike Defendants' Memorandum of Costs Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Hearing |
Reply to Opposition to Motion to Tax or Strike |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition to Motion to Tax or Strike |
|
March 26, 2021 | Hearing |
Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Tax or Strike Defendants' Memorandum of Costs |
|
March 26, 2021 | Hearing |
Motion to Tax Costs 3/10/2021 Plaintiffs, SARAH A. MADDEN; SAMANTHA L CAPLES Motion to Tax or Strike Defendants' Memorandum of Costs Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Tax Costs 3/10/2021 Plaintiffs, SARAH A. MADDEN; SAMANTHA L CAPLES Motion to Tax or Strike Defendants' Memorandum of Costs Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Tax or Strike Defendants' Memorandum of Costs |
|
March 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Renotice of Motion Re: Motion to Tax or Strike Defendants' Memorandum of Costs Hearing Date: 04/09/21 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 17 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.