Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Miller, Ola M., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by O'Dell, Seth N, Oldfield, Gerald H, against Miller, Lazaroy, represented by Clemence, Jared, Dessy, Ronald D, Lahiri, Indra, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePulskamp, Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management185 days |
Filing DateNovember 08, 2018 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial612 days |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
doc12659520240327095409
Date: March 27, 2024doc12636120240320114938
Date: March 20, 2024doc12635720240320095935
Date: March 20, 2024doc12556920240305072249
Date: March 05, 2024doc12556820240305072231
Date: March 05, 2024Notice_of_OSC
Date: February 29, 2024doc12503720240222071129
Date: February 22, 2024doc12503620240222071102
Date: February 22, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 15, 2023Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: December 21, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 29, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: June 16, 2022Further Case Management Conference
Date: December 03, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 16, 2022Ruling
Date: November 06, 2023Ruling
Date: October 04, 2023Motion for Judgment on Pleadings
Date: December 08, 2023Ruling
Date: February 16, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: July 13, 2020Motion for Judgment on Pleadings
Date: November 03, 2023Motion to Amend (Pre-Disposition)
Date: December 05, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 24, 2019Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 21, 2024Motion to Compel
Date: November 29, 2022Further Case Management Conference
Date: March 09, 2022Motion to Continue
Date: September 07, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 09, 2023Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: June 12, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: March 30, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 13, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: September 26, 2023Ruling
Date: January 12, 2021Ruling
Date: June 12, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: May 13, 2019Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: February 26, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: November 29, 2022Order to Show Cause
Date: November 13, 2018Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: February 22, 2024Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: October 06, 2023Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further
Date: October 13, 2023doc12495820240220155713
Date: February 21, 2024doc12495920240220155739
Date: February 21, 202453756CaseM00b9a7
Date: February 22, 2022CMC STMT 3.09.2022
Date: February 25, 2022Request_to_Vacate_Hearings
Date: December 14, 202365960Motio00e047
Date: November 04, 2022STIPULATION ON DEFTS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCVY RESPONSES
Date: November 28, 2022STIPULATION ON MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER & VACATE TRIAL DATES
Date: November 28, 202267322Answe006c16
Date: December 05, 202267462Notic00744d
Date: December 07, 2022sub of attorney
Date: January 27, 2023doc10957120230316102718
Date: March 16, 2023doc12007620231023142311
Date: October 23, 2023Reply_to_Opposition_10_2_Motion_for_Judgment
Date: October 27, 2023Request_for_Dismissal
Date: November 13, 2023doc12063920231106064356
Date: November 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC 3.1385 cont'd from 12/21/23, 02/22/24 |
|
May 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC 3.1385 cont'd from 12/21/23, 02/22/24 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | doc12659520240327095409 | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | doc12636120240320114938 | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | doc12635720240320095935 | |
March 20, 2024 | Hearing |
Motion (Pre-Disposition) 2/22/24 reservation expires 2/24/24 Plaintiff Motion to Substitute party/custodian Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion (Pre-Disposition) 2/22/24 reservation expires 2/24/24 Plaintiff Motion to Substitute party/custodian |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Regular 2/22/24 reservation expires 2/24/24 Plaintiff Motion to Substitute party/custodian |
|
March 20, 2024 | Hearing |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Regular 2/22/24 reservation expires 2/24/24 Plaintiff Motion to Substitute party/custodian Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | doc12556920240305072249 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.