Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Westcor Land And Title Insurance Company, An Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Quall, Matthew W, against De Luna, Francisco J, De Luna, Maria De Los Angeles, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Lampe, David R. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management185 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2018 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions81 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time229 days |
Order to Show Cause
Date: March 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2019 | Hearing |
Debtor's Examination as to Maria De Los Angeles De Luna Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
April 04, 2019 | Hearing |
Debtor's Examination as to Francisco Javier De Luna Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Debtor's Examination as to Francisco Javier De Luna Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Debtor's Examination as to Maria De Los Angeles De Luna Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
April 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Notice of withdrawal of application and order for appearance and examination as to Francisco Javier De Luna |
|
April 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Notice of Withdrawal of Application and Order for Appearance and Examination as to Maria De Los Angeles De Luna |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of withdrawal of application and order for appearance and examination as to Francisco Javier De Luna |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Application and Order for Appearance and Examination as to Maria De Los Angeles De Luna |
|
March 08, 2019 | Hearing | Abstract Issued | |
March 01, 2019 | Hearing |
Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Application & Order for Appearance & Examination of Maria De Los Angeles De Luna |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.