Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Big Washington, Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Eilenberg, Benjamin A, Jacobs, Richard B, against Benhong, Ruth M. Fry As Trustee Of The T & R Fry Family Trust, Thomas H. Fry As Trustee Of The T&R Fry Family Trust, represented by Alexander, William L, Palla, Alisyn J, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Schuett, Stephen D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchuett, Stephen D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2017 |
Category26-Cv Other Real Property-Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial675 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions185 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: October 04, 2021Trial Setting Conference
Date: October 12, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 06, 2021Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: October 07, 2021Motion for Reconsideration - Pre-Disposition (CL/CS/CV)
Date: December 14, 2021Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: December 29, 2021Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition)
Date: January 21, 20221.13.22 Reply-Motion for Sanctions
Date: January 14, 20221.13.22 Reply-Decl. EE
Date: January 14, 2022012022.Status Report
Date: January 21, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication
Date: January 12, 2022020122 Status Report re Appeal
Date: February 01, 20222.1.22 Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 01, 20222.1.22 Opposition
Date: February 01, 2022Mtn for Protective Order-signed
Date: February 03, 2022Ex Parte re Protective Order
Date: February 03, 2022Opp to Ex Parte for Protective Order 2.3.22
Date: February 03, 2022Decl. EE in Opposition to Ex Parte 2.3.22
Date: February 03, 2022Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition)
Date: February 04, 2022MSA-Notice
Date: February 08, 2022MSA-Separate Statement(FINAL)
Date: February 08, 2022MSA-Memo (020822)
Date: February 08, 2022POS 2.8.22
Date: February 08, 2022MSA-Decl. SBVE
Date: February 08, 2022Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: February 07, 2022Ex Parte Steph Depo
Date: March 02, 2022Opp to Ex Parte for to Advance Depo Date of S. Smith 3.3.22
Date: March 02, 2022Decl. EE
Date: March 02, 2022Mtn re Steph Depo_Redacted
Date: March 03, 2022Order re Motion for Sanctions
Date: March 04, 2022021622.Letter.to court (Judge Barmann) re Order
Date: March 04, 2022Opp to Motion for Protective Order 3.4.22
Date: March 04, 2022Ex Parte Advance Time re Steph Depo
Date: March 16, 2022Opp to Ex Parte for to Advance Depo Date of S. Smith 3.16.22
Date: March 16, 2022Notice to Court - Summary of Response for Prep of Proposed Order (Fry) - 032222
Date: March 22, 2022[Proposed] Order
Date: March 22, 2022Notice to Court-Summary of Response for Prep of Proposed Order
Date: March 22, 2022Memorandum 4.8.22
Date: April 08, 2022Notice of Motion 4.8.22
Date: April 08, 2022Decl. EE 4.8.22
Date: April 08, 2022[Proposed] Order
Date: April 08, 2022Objection to 3rd MSA
Date: April 13, 2022Opp to 3nd MSA
Date: April 13, 20223rd MSA-Separate Statement(FINAL)
Date: April 13, 2022MSA-SBVE 4.15.22
Date: April 15, 2022Opposition to MSA 4.15.22
Date: April 15, 2022POS 4.15.22
Date: April 15, 2022Response to Separate Statement 4.15.22
Date: April 15, 2022Reply-Response to Additional Facts 4.22.22
Date: April 22, 2022Reply to MSA 4.22.22
Date: April 22, 2022Opp 2 MTC. Docs. Signed. 5.4.22
Date: May 04, 2022Motion for Site Visit by Jury
Date: May 23, 2022Notice of Entry of Order re FRY MSA
Date: June 16, 2022Notice of Entry of Order re BW MSA
Date: June 16, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 11, 2020Ex Parte Continue Trial Date
Date: August 31, 2022Defendants brief re proposed jury instructions from plaintiff
Date: November 30, 2022Motion in Limine Common Ps and As
Date: November 30, 2022Amended Exhibit List
Date: November 30, 2022MIL-9 (Reference to LA Waterkeeper)
Date: November 30, 2022Amended Jury Instructions 113022
Date: November 30, 2022MIL-11 (Reference to IRS Case)
Date: November 30, 2022Brief re admissions contained in pleadings
Date: November 30, 2022Opposition to Site Visit
Date: November 30, 2022Proof of Service re Pretrial Docs 113022
Date: November 30, 2022MIL-10 (Hickman)
Date: November 30, 2022Reply to MIL-1 (Consent)
Date: November 30, 2022Reply to MIL-3 (Bifurcation)
Date: November 30, 2022Reply to MIL-7 (Reference to RCRA)
Date: November 30, 2022Reply to MIL-6 (Reference to Plastic)
Date: November 30, 2022Reply to MIL-8 (Determination by Court)
Date: November 30, 2022Opposition to MIL 3
Date: November 30, 2022Second Amended Exhibit List
Date: December 09, 2022Trial Brief (FINAL)
Date: December 12, 2022MIL-12 re Fry
Date: December 12, 2022First Amended Answer
Date: December 12, 2022Motion to Dismiss (FINAL)
Date: December 13, 2022Decl of EE re 402 Hearing
Date: December 13, 2022Motion for Nonsuit (FINAL)
Date: December 20, 2022Proposed Order on motion for directed verdict (damages for cost of removal)
Date: December 22, 2022Proposed Order on motion for directed verdict (damages for loss of rent)
Date: December 22, 2022Proposed Judgment. Fry (1)
Date: December 31, 2022Notice of entry of Judgment 010523
Date: January 05, 2023Motion.for.Fees-Declaration (011723)
Date: January 18, 2023Memo of Costs 011723
Date: January 18, 2023Motion.for.Fees-Notice (FINAL)
Date: January 18, 2023Motion.for.Fees Memo(011723)
Date: January 18, 2023Motion.for.Fees PROPOSED ORDER
Date: January 18, 2023Motion.for.Fees-RJN
Date: January 18, 2023Opp to Atty Fee Motion
Date: February 02, 2023Motion.for.Fees-Declaration of EE 020823
Date: February 08, 2023Reply of Fry Defendants to opposition to Motion for Fees FINAL 020823
Date: February 08, 2023plastic appeal-signed
Date: February 13, 2023Proposed Amended Judgment
Date: February 16, 2023POS re [Proposed] Amended Judgment
Date: February 16, 2023Abstract of Judgment 022823
Date: February 28, 2023Notice of entry of amended Judgment with attached judgment
Date: March 02, 2023Notice of entry of order Awarding Attorney Fees
Date: March 06, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: September 21, 2018Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: April 04, 2018Order to Show Cause
Date: October 10, 2017Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: August 05, 2020Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)
Date: July 06, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: June 09, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: August 05, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: July 06, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: July 06, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: August 05, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: June 09, 2020Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: July 12, 2019Motion to Vacate (Post-Disposition)
Date: December 07, 2020Motion to Vacate (Post-Disposition)
Date: January 25, 2021Motion to Vacate (Post-Disposition)
Date: February 24, 2021Ruling
Date: November 15, 2021Motion for Leave
Date: November 22, 2021Opp to Motion re Terminating Sanctions
Date: January 07, 2022MSJ-Reply (010722)
Date: January 07, 2022Response to Big Washington Additional Separate Statement 1.7.22
Date: January 07, 2022128.7 re MSJ #2
Date: January 11, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 01, 2019Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: August 05, 2019Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition
Date: August 14, 2018Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 04, 2021Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: March 17, 2021Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further
Date: August 09, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: July 15, 2019Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: July 19, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: July 17, 2019Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: August 12, 2021Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further
Date: August 02, 2019Trial Setting Conference
Date: August 29, 2019Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 09, 2020Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: March 10, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 25, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 01, 2019Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 22, 2021Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: March 12, 2020Motion for Fees - Pre-Disposition (CL/CV)
Date: September 25, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of order Awarding Attorney Fees | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of amended Judgment with attached judgment | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment 022823 | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Amended Judgment | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | POS re [Proposed] Amended Judgment | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | plastic appeal-signed | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion.for.Fees-Declaration of EE 020823 | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply of Fry Defendants to opposition to Motion for Fees FINAL 020823 | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Opp to Atty Fee Motion | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion.for.Fees-Declaration (011723) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.