Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Abigail Vilorio As Successor In Interest To Jose Vilorio, Viveny Aceves As Successor In Interest To Jose Vilorio, Sarai Lorenzana As Successor In Interest To Jose Vilorio, Veronica Lira As Successor In Interest To Jose Vilorio, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Whittington, Mark Joseph, against Mcirvin, Timothy, Burdick, Zachary, City Of Bakersfield, represented by Marderosian, Michael G, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Chapin, Sidney P. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 12, 2017 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2017 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
September 25, 2017 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
July 17, 2017 | Hearing | Ruling | |
July 12, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice of Removal of Action (JBSIS) Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal of Case to Federal Court by Defendants |
|
July 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Removal of Action (JBSIS) Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal of Case to Federal Court by Defendants |
|
June 19, 2017 | Hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint As to Timothy McIrvin. Personal service. |
|
June 19, 2017 | Hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint As to Zachary Burdick. Personal Service. |
|
June 19, 2017 | Hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint As to City of Bakersfield. Personal Service. |
|
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint As to Zachary Burdick. Personal Service. |
|
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint As to Timothy McIrvin. Personal service. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.