Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Saldivar, Evangelina, filed a(n) 16-Cv Fraud - Civil Unlimited case against Adt Llc Dba Adt Security Services, represented by Spooner, Gabriel S., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Lampe, David R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLampe, David R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2017 |
Category16-Cv Fraud - Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial787 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions420 days |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time726 days |
Demurrer
Date: August 02, 2017Demurrer First Amended Complaint
Date: October 12, 2017Demurrer First Amended Complaint
Date: October 12, 2017Demurrer
Date: January 30, 2018Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: January 30, 2018Demurrer
Date: January 30, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication
Date: January 14, 2019Motion for Reconsideration - Post-Disposition
Date: March 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Court Trial t/e 4-6 days no fees posted jury wavied by all parties absent further order of the court Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
March 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Trial t/e 4-6 days no fees posted jury wavied by all parties absent further order of the court Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Reconsideration - Post-Disposition 03/12/2019 Motion for Reconsideration - Post-Disposition 2/07/2019 Plaintiff: EVANGELINA SALDIVAR Motion to Reconsider Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
March 12, 2019 | Hearing |
Motion for Reconsideration - Post-Disposition 2/07/2019 Plaintiff: EVANGELINA SALDIVAR Motion to Reconsider Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
March 12, 2019 | Hearing |
Motion (Post-Disposition) 2/7/2019 Plaintiff: EVANGELINA SALDIVAR Motion to Reconsider Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion (Post-Disposition) 2/7/2019 Plaintiff: EVANGELINA SALDIVAR Motion to Reconsider Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
February 22, 2019 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference C/T & FSC SET 3/25/19 9AM DEPT. 11 T/E 4-6 DAYS Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference C/T & FSC SET 3/25/19 9AM DEPT. 11 T/E 4-6 DAYS Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
February 07, 2019 | Hearing |
Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion for Summary Judgement/ Adjudication |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.