Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kaur, Niranjan, filed a(n) 16-Cv Fraud - Civil Unlimited case represented by Kumpel, Frederick, against Heer, Gurinder Singh, Kaur, Sukdeep, Kaur, Sukhdeep, represented by Hodges, Nathan M, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Schuett, Stephen D. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2016 |
Category16-Cv Fraud - Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial698 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions357 days |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1117 days |
Further Case Management Conference
Date: August 28, 2017Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: May 01, 2017Demurrer First Amended Complaint
Date: August 28, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: September 15, 2017Motion to Strike
Date: November 28, 2017Demurrer
Date: November 21, 2017Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: November 08, 2019Motion for Leave
Date: October 16, 2018Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition)
Date: January 06, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: September 28, 2018Motion to Strike
Date: January 17, 2019Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition)
Date: December 18, 2019Motion for Leave
Date: May 25, 2018BCV16102902 REQ CONFERENCE
Date: June 22, 2022BCV16102902 CMC STATEMENT
Date: July 13, 2022BCV16102902 PLAINTIFF MSC STTMNT
Date: November 27, 2022BCV16102902 N KAUR DISMISSAL
Date: September 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2023 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC Rule 3.1385 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
September 05, 2023 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) with prejudice as to the entire action |
|
September 04, 2023 | Docket Event | BCV16102902 N KAUR DISMISSAL | |
July 12, 2023 | Hearing | Ruling | |
July 10, 2023 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference c/c with CT Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
July 10, 2023 | Hearing |
Court Trial T/E 2-3 days Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
July 03, 2023 | Hearing | Notice of Settlement - Conditional | |
December 02, 2022 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference FCMC and Court Trial: 07/10/2023 at 9am in Div H; T/E: 2-3 days Judge: Vega - Retired, Louie L. |
|
November 28, 2022 | Hearing | Settlement Conference Statement | |
November 27, 2022 | Docket Event | BCV16102902 PLAINTIFF MSC STTMNT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.