Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Herrera, Juan, Medina, Cosme, Munoz, Ariel, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Chiang, Kevin, against Hale, Jim, Hydro Resources-West Inc., Hydro Resources- West Inc., A Delaware Corporation, represented by Silbergeld, Arthur F, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Schuett, Stephen D. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management181 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2016 |
Category36-Cv Wrongful Termination - Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial495 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time833 days |
Motion to Bifurcate
Date: March 09, 2018Order to Show Cause
Date: November 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2019 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal why Complaint should not be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to CRC 3.3185 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal why Complaint should not be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to CRC 3.3185 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
March 13, 2019 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) With Prejudice - As to Entire Action |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) With Prejudice - As to Entire Action |
|
February 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E 7 DAYS Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E 7 DAYS Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
February 15, 2019 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference TRJ 02/25/19 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference TRJ 02/25/19 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
January 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
January 22, 2019 | Hearing | Ruling |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.