Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Redding, Michael L., Redding, Sharon F, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Bailey, John L, against All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien Or Interest In The Property Described In The Complaint Adverse To Plaintiff'S Title, Or Any Cloud Upon Plaintiff'S Title Thereto, The David And Frances L Mcgarrah Family Trust Dated 11 22 94, By David Mcgarrah, As Trustee, The Testate And Intestate Successors Of David Mcgarrah, Who Is Believed To Be Deceased, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Non, Fast Track presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management181 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2016 |
Category26-Cv Other Real Property-Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions272 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time272 days |
Order to Show Cause
Date: November 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2017 | Hearing |
Exhibit(s) List PLAINTIFFS |
|
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Exhibit(s) List PLAINTIFFS |
|
August 29, 2017 | Hearing |
Judgment
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
August 28, 2017 | Hearing |
DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Default 08/28/2017 DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
August 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference Cont'd from 05/30/2017 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference 08/01/2017 Case Management Conference Cont'd from 05/30/2017 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
July 17, 2017 | Hearing | Case Management Statement | |
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
July 05, 2017 | Hearing |
Default Setting Card Hearing Date: 8/28/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 12 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.