Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hernandez, Mariela, Robles, Francisco Javier, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2016 |
Category43-Nc Name Change - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time68 days |
Petition to Change Minor Name
Date: September 06, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Petition to Change Minor Name 09/06/2016 Petition to Change Minor Name MINOR Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
September 06, 2016 | Hearing |
Decree Changing Name
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
September 06, 2016 | Hearing |
Petition to Change Minor Name MINOR Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
August 09, 2016 | Hearing |
Proof of Publication Published in El Popular July 15, 22, 29 August 5 all of 2016. |
|
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Published in El Popular July 15, 22, 29 August 5 all of 2016. |
|
July 11, 2016 | Hearing | Interpreter Needed For Petitioner | |
July 06, 2016 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: To Publish in El Popular Hearing Date: 9-6-16 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12 |
|
July 06, 2016 | Hearing |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted AS TO FRANCISCO JAVIER ROBLES Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: To Publish in El Popular Hearing Date: 9-6-16 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12 |
|
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted AS TO FRANCISCO JAVIER ROBLES Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.