Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
O'Neal, Robert A., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Clark, Matthew C, against Lewis Towing 2, Inc., Lutz, Jeremy Dale, represented by Fox, Dana Alden, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management187 days |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2016 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial424 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time322 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2017 | Hearing |
Jury Trial & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 5 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 5 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
August 11, 2017 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference FCMC 08/28/17; JURY TRIAL 08/28/17; T/E 5 DAYS Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference FCMC 08/28/17; JURY TRIAL 08/28/17; T/E 5 DAYS Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
August 04, 2017 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
May 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION. |
|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION. |
|
May 03, 2017 | Hearing | Ruling | |
May 02, 2017 | Hearing | Notice of Settlement - Conditional |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.