Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Francine Munoz, An Individual, On Behalf Of Herself And Others Similarly Situated, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Kingsley, Eric B, against Central California Foundation For Health Dba Delano Regional Medical Center, represented by Harding, Robert D, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management185 days |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2015 |
Category15-Cv Other Employment - Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1119 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1119 days |
Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: July 09, 2018Further Case Management Conference
Date: September 27, 2017Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: September 27, 2017Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement
Date: January 10, 2019Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)
Date: July 09, 2018Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: July 30, 2018Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: July 30, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion (Pre-Disposition) 07/30/2018 Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement continued from 11/26/2018 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
January 10, 2019 | Hearing |
Judgment FINAL- refer to Final Judgment Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
January 10, 2019 | Hearing |
Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement- GRANTED Refer to order. Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
January 10, 2019 | Hearing |
Motion for Fees - Pre-Disposition (CL/CV) continued from 11/26/2018 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
January 10, 2019 | Hearing |
Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement continued from 11/26/2018 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
January 10, 2019 | Hearing |
Case Status Conference counsel do not need to file updated CMC statements Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment FINAL- refer to Final Judgment Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Fees - Pre-Disposition (CL/CV) 11/26/2018 Motion for Fees - Pre-Disposition (CL/CV) continued from 11/26/2018 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement- GRANTED Refer to order. Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement 01/10/2019 Case Status Conference counsel do not need to file updated CMC statements Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.