Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sampson, Mcarthur, Chisholm-Sampson, Kornelia H, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Bates, Seven, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims - 1,500 Or Less |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2019 | Hearing |
Abstract Issued C-BIN |
|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Abstract Issued C-BIN |
|
May 02, 2019 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered SC-130 and SC-133. No forwarding address |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered SC-130 and SC-133. No forwarding address |
|
May 01, 2019 | Hearing | Image of Archived Documents | |
April 22, 2019 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered Notice of Entry of Judgment. Sent to forwarding address |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered Notice of Entry of Judgment. Sent to forwarding address |
|
April 15, 2019 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties (Small Claims) SC-133 MAILED TO DEFENDANT |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties (Small Claims) SC-133 MAILED TO DEFENDANT |
|
April 11, 2019 | Hearing |
Small Claims Trial
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.