Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Vasquez, Joshua Paul, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Markham, Antonie Jean, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Brumfield, Lorna H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrumfield, Lorna H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims Trial De Novo |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions145 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Cycle Time157 days |
Trial De Novo
Date: April 18, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2017 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO AS TO ANTONIE JEAN MARKHAM |
|
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO AS TO ANTONIE JEAN MARKHAM |
|
May 24, 2017 | Hearing |
Judgment for Respondent after Trial de Novo
Judge: Brumfield, Lorna H. |
|
May 17, 2017 | Hearing |
Exhibit(s) List PLAINTIFF/DEFENDANT |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Exhibit(s) List PLAINTIFF/DEFENDANT |
|
May 09, 2017 | Hearing | Ruling | |
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Trial De Novo 04/18/2017 Trial De Novo APPEAL OF THE SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT Judge: Brumfield, Lorna H. |
|
April 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Trial De Novo APPEAL OF THE SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT Judge: Brumfield, Lorna H. |
|
January 17, 2017 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered AS TO NOTICE OF TRIAL DE NOVO HEARING - SENT TO FWD ADDRESS PROVIDED BY USPS |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered AS TO NOTICE OF TRIAL DE NOVO HEARING - SENT TO FWD ADDRESS PROVIDED BY USPS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.