Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bowling, Jennifer, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Edith Neumann, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2015 |
CategorySmall Claims - 5,001 To 10,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time203 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipt for Records Returned Received From: Orange County Superior Court |
|
March 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Receipt for Records Returned Received From: Orange County Superior Court |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing Re: Transfer of case to Orange County Superior Court Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
March 10, 2016 | Hearing |
Compliance Hearing Re: Transfer of case to Orange County Superior Court Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
February 22, 2016 | Hearing | Receipt for Records Mailed | |
February 22, 2016 | Hearing | Notice of Transfer of Case | |
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
02/11/16 MO: Small Claims Trial Small Claims Trial Cont'd from 11/10/15; $10,000 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
February 11, 2016 | Hearing |
Small Claims Trial Cont'd from 11/10/15; $10,000 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF JENNIFER BOWLING IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER |
|
February 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Declaration OF JENNIFER BOWLING IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.