Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Arnold, Christina M., against Noriega, Arturo, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 02, 2020 |
Category09-Cl <10K Rule 3.740 Collections - Assignee Bp6322.1(C)(1) |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)
Date: June 08, 2021Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)
Date: June 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 06/08/2021 Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) Plaintiff's Counsel re: imposition of sanctions including dismissal of the complaint for failing to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.720. Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 06/08/2021 Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) to Defendant re: imposition of sanctions including striking the answer for failing to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.720. Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
June 08, 2021 | Hearing |
Order Dismissing Action (Full)
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
June 08, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) to Defendant re: imposition of sanctions including striking the answer for failing to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.720. Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
June 08, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) Plaintiff's Counsel re: imposition of sanctions including dismissal of the complaint for failing to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.720. Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
April 21, 2021 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered Notice of Hearing addressed to Arturo Noriega; undeliverable |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered Notice of Hearing addressed to Arturo Noriega; undeliverable |
|
April 20, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
April 06, 2021 | Hearing |
Notice of Hearing Order to Show Cause to Defendant; Hrg: 6/08/2021 @ 8:30 am in Dept. 12 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.