Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Anchor General Insurance Co., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Reese, Breanne L., against 1, Doe, Alvarez, Jason Scott, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management183 days |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2020 |
Category09-Cl <10K Other Collections - Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Order to Show Cause
Date: July 21, 2020Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: January 14, 2021Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: July 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Cont. from 07/01/21 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Cont. from 07/01/21 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 07/01/2021 Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 cont'd from 11/03/20, 01/14/21 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
July 01, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 cont'd from 11/03/20, 01/14/21 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
June 24, 2021 | Hearing |
Declaration opf counsel regarding order to show cause hearing |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration opf counsel regarding order to show cause hearing |
|
May 26, 2021 | Hearing |
Proof of Publication as to Jason Scott Alvarez via The Bakersfield News Observer running April 21st, 28th, May 5th & 12th. |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication as to Jason Scott Alvarez via The Bakersfield News Observer running April 21st, 28th, May 5th & 12th. |
|
May 18, 2021 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice as to Proof of Publication: The Case number listed on the Proof of Publication does not conform to the case you filed under BCL-20-013121. Please review. |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Electronic Rejection Notice as to Proof of Publication: The Case number listed on the Proof of Publication does not conform to the case you filed under BCL-20-013121. Please review. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.