Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc., A Delaware Corporation, filed a(n) 42-Cl >10K <25K Other Complaint - Civil Limited case represented by Lee, Cindy J., against Avila, Melinda, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2020 |
Category42-Cl >10K <25K Other Complaint - Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Petition
Date: July 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2020 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
September 09, 2020 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Mechanic's Lien Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Mechanic's Lien Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
July 21, 2020 | Hearing | Request for Dismissal (Entire) | |
July 16, 2020 | Hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Melinda Avila via personal service. |
|
July 16, 2020 | Hearing |
Notice of Change of Attorney Contact Information |
|
July 16, 2020 | Hearing |
Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Attorney Contact Information |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Melinda Avila via personal service. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.