Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Onemain Financial Group, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Berk, Camryn P, against Williams, Nicole S, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Rule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2022 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) Cont. from 12/07/20 No disposition in 2 yrs, case to be dismissed. Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) Cont. from 12/07/20 No disposition in 2 yrs, case to be dismissed. Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
December 07, 2020 | Hearing |
To ensure the public has access to court proceedings during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court will be audio live streaming all non-confidential matters. This alternative method for observing courtroom proceedings is strongly encouraged during this time for all non-parties to avoid attending court in-person where social distancing protocols and limited courtroom access applies. It is also available because Judicial Officers may have to limit, or impose other reasonable restrictions upon, public access to their courtrooms and adjacent hallways based on recommended social distancing requirements. Each judge retains the discretion and authority to refuse, limit or terminate audio live streaming of the proceedings, or portions thereof, pursuant to the factors and prohibitions articulated in California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, and in consideration of other statutory and constitutional provisions. By Court Order and California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, audio live streams may NOT be recorded, broadcasted or rebroadcasted without prior written permission from the Court. Witnesses who have been instructed not to discuss their testimony or court proceedings with others may not listen to the audio streaming of any portion of the trial. |
|
December 07, 2020 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
To ensure the public has access to court proceedings during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court will be audio live streaming all non-confidential matters. This alternative method for observing courtroom proceedings is strongly encouraged during this time for all non-parties to avoid attending court in-person where social distancing protocols and limited courtroom access applies. It is also available because Judicial Officers may have to limit, or impose other reasonable restrictions upon, public access to their courtrooms and adjacent hallways based on recommended social distancing requirements. Each judge retains the discretion and authority to refuse, limit or terminate audio live streaming of the proceedings, or portions thereof, pursuant to the factors and prohibitions articulated in California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, and in consideration of other statutory and constitutional provisions. By Court Order and California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, audio live streams may NOT be recorded, broadcasted or rebroadcasted without prior written permission from the Court. Witnesses who have been instructed not to discuss their testimony or court proceedings with others may not listen to the audio streaming of any portion of the trial. |
|
July 02, 2020 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
January 21, 2020 | Hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Nicole S. Williams via sub service. |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Nicole S. Williams via sub service. |
|
January 06, 2020 | Hearing |
Declaration of Non-Service as to Nicole S. Williams, 1 attempt. |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Non-Service as to Nicole S. Williams, 1 attempt. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.