Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Financial Credit Network, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Abbott, Brett T, against Magdalena I Perez Aka Magdalena Aceves, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2019 |
Category09-Cl <10K Rule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2020 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
August 07, 2019 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
April 18, 2019 | Hearing | Writ of Execution Issued | |
April 18, 2019 | Hearing | Abstract Issued | |
April 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Judgment by Default by Clerk as to Defendant Magdalena I Perez aka Magdalena Aceves |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment by Default by Clerk as to Defendant Magdalena I Perez aka Magdalena Aceves |
|
April 02, 2019 | Hearing |
Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2) Declaration of Josefine Navarrete |
|
April 02, 2019 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) as to Does, without prejudice |
|
April 02, 2019 | Hearing |
Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment as to Defendant Magdalena I Perez aka Magdalena Aceves on Complaint filed 1/31/19 |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2) Declaration of Josefine Navarrete |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.