Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nielsen, Warren, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Kummer, Dixon G, against Johnson, Porscha, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 18, 2018 |
Category32-Cl <10K Unlawful Detainer - Residential - Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions13 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time13 days |
Motion to Set Aside (Post-Disposition)
Date: November 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2019 | Hearing | Writ Returned Wholly Satisfied | |
January 23, 2019 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
December 07, 2018 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys Former Attorney: New Attorney: |
|
December 07, 2018 | Hearing |
Order DENYING MOTION Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order DENYING MOTION Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys Former Attorney: New Attorney: |
|
December 06, 2018 | Hearing | Ruling | |
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside (Post-Disposition) 11/27/2018 Motion to Set Aside (Post-Disposition) Motion to set aside and vacate default judgment. Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
November 27, 2018 | Hearing |
Motion to Set Aside (Post-Disposition) Motion to set aside and vacate default judgment. Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
November 26, 2018 | Hearing |
Opposition to Motion TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.