Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Crown Asset Management Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Farzin, Ali, against White, George, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 30, 2018 |
Category09-Cl <10K Rule 3.740 Collections - Assignee Bp6322.1(C)(1) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions226 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time226 days |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)
Date: January 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2019 | Hearing | Memorandum of Costs | |
October 16, 2019 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued County of Kern, Returned via e-file. |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued County of Kern, Returned via e-file. |
|
April 10, 2019 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 11/14/2018 Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) cont'd from 11/14/18 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
January 23, 2019 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) cont'd from 11/14/18 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
December 12, 2018 | Hearing |
Judgment by Default by Clerk Against George White Jr. |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment by Default by Clerk Against George White Jr. |
|
December 07, 2018 | Hearing |
Declaration Statement of Account" |
|
December 07, 2018 | Hearing |
Declaration Assignment" |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.