Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Progressinve West Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nivinskus, Mark R, against Hatfield, Johnny, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management185 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
Category22-Cl >10K <25K Auto - Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time319 days |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: June 20, 2017Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: August 22, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2017 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on October 24, 2017. Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on October 24, 2017. Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
November 14, 2017 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) without prejudice |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) without prejudice |
|
October 30, 2017 | Hearing |
Order to Appear and Order to Show Cause 12/19/17, 830am, Dept 12 |
|
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Appear and Order to Show Cause 12/19/17, 830am, Dept 12 |
|
October 24, 2017 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 08/22/2017 Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Continued from 06/20/2017. Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
August 22, 2017 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Continued from 06/20/2017. Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
July 03, 2017 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.