Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Dyle, Scott D., against Graviss, Cory P, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 30, 2016 |
Category09-Cl <10K Rule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions477 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time377 days |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)
Date: October 18, 2017Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)
Date: August 09, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2018 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal Not Entered Dismissal without prejudice was already entered on 12-12-17 |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Not Entered Dismissal without prejudice was already entered on 12-12-17 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
December 20, 2017 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) Continued from 10/18/17. Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) Continued from 10/18/17. Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
December 12, 2017 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice |
|
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice |
|
November 20, 2017 | Hearing |
Order to Appear and Order to Show Cause 1/16/18, 830am, Dept 12 |
|
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Appear and Order to Show Cause 1/16/18, 830am, Dept 12 |
|
November 13, 2017 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.