Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Quall, Matthew W, against Mugleston, Bruce, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2016 |
Category09-Cl <10K Rule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time281 days |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)
Date: August 01, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2017 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
October 03, 2017 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) Cont'd from 05/30/17 and 08/01/17 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) Cont'd from 05/30/17 and 08/01/17 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
September 05, 2017 | Hearing | Request for Dismissal (Entire) | |
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 08/01/2017 Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) Cont'd from 05/30/17 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
August 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) Cont'd from 05/30/17 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
May 30, 2017 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
January 23, 2017 | Hearing |
Declaration of Non-Service 1 ATTEMPT |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Non-Service 1 ATTEMPT |
|
November 28, 2016 | Hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.