Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Riverdale Village, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mccormack, Sandra Kuhn, against Ferguson, Teresa, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 28, 2016 |
Category32-Cl <10K Unlawful Detainer - Residential - Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions59 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time59 days |
Motion (Post-Disposition)
Date: September 25, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion (Post-Disposition) 09/25/2017 Motion (Post-Disposition) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND VACATE JUDGMENT Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
September 25, 2017 | Hearing |
Motion (Post-Disposition) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND VACATE JUDGMENT Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
September 12, 2017 | Hearing | Opposition to Motion | |
September 07, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion re:to set asidedefault and vacate judgment Hearing Date:09/25/2017 Time: 08:30am Department/Division 12 |
|
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion re:to set asidedefault and vacate judgment Hearing Date:09/25/2017 Time: 08:30am Department/Division 12 |
|
August 25, 2017 | Hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
August 25, 2017 | Hearing | Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted | |
August 24, 2017 | Hearing | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
March 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
February 24, 2017 | Hearing |
Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied AS TO POSSESSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.