Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hussain Rashik, Individually And Dba Saif Industries, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gibbs, Steven G, against 4 Star Electronics, Inc., 4 Star Electronics, Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Mortenson, Michael D., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 09, 2016 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition)
Date: October 03, 2017Motion to Tax Costs
Date: June 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2020 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
June 27, 2019 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Order on Motion to Tax Costs | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order on Motion to Tax Costs | |
June 24, 2019 | Hearing |
Order on Motion to tax Costs and Objection to Satisfaction of Judgment Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to tax Costs and Objection to Satisfaction of Judgment Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Tax Costs 06/18/2019 Motion to Tax Costs 04/22/2019 Defendant: 4 STAR ELECTRONICS, INC. Motion to Tax Costs Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
June 18, 2019 | Hearing |
Motion to Tax Costs 04/22/2019 Defendant: 4 STAR ELECTRONICS, INC. Motion to Tax Costs Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
June 03, 2019 | Hearing | Opposition to Objection to Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment | |
June 03, 2019 | Hearing | Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Opposition to Objection to Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.