Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Carlyon, William J., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Bowen, Charles Chris, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 31, 2015 |
Category32-Cl <10K Unlawful Detainer - Residential - Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions74 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time49 days |
Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)
Date: October 19, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2015 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
November 17, 2015 | Hearing |
Writ of Possession Issued Returned via Attorney Messenger |
|
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued Returned via Attorney Messenger |
|
November 13, 2015 | Hearing |
Judgment after Trial
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
October 26, 2015 | Hearing | Memorandum of Costs | |
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute Order-Unlawful Detainer Trial Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) Answer filed by Charles Chris Bowen. Time estimate 1 hour. Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
October 19, 2015 | Hearing |
Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) Answer filed by Charles Chris Bowen. Time estimate 1 hour. Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
September 22, 2015 | Hearing | Notice of Trial | |
September 22, 2015 | Hearing | Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD) | |
September 10, 2015 | Hearing |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted By Clerk as to Charles Chris Bowen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.