Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bohrman Allison, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Amin Parag L., against Bennett International Group Llc, Bennett Motor Express Llc, Lhullier Michael James, Seamons Johnny C., represented by Birch Yvonne, Snyder Barry Clifford, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time560 days |
Answer; Filed by: Michael James Lhullier (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Bennett International Group, LLC (Defendant); Johnny C. Seamons (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Summons Filed by Allison Bohrman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Updated -- Notice of Settlement: Filed By: Allison Bohrman (Plaintiff); Result: Rejected; Result Date:
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Allison Bohrman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Bennett Motor Express, LLC (Doe 1) Filed by Allison Bohrman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Allison Bohrman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Allison Bohrman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Answer Filed by Michael James Lhuillier Erroneously Sued As Michael James Lhullier (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Allison Bohrman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Allison Bohrman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Allison Bohrman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Allison Bohrman (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Answer Filed by Bennett International Group, LLC (Defendant); Johnny C. Seamons (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Allison Bohrman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Allison Bohrman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Allison Bohrman (Plaintiff)
Date: April 07, 2020Notice of Settlement Filed by Allison Bohrman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Answer (tp Pltf Unverified Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Change of Email Address)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Bennett Motor Express, LLC (Doe 1)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/17/2020)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: April 07, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.