Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Williams Michele, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Crandall Sean William, Dolin Tionna Grace, Hooper Donna Jill, Sogoyan Gregory, against Kia Motors America Inc., represented by Raue Patrick, Raue Patrick John, Tolmoyan Ani, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management216 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions111 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
SUMMONS -
Date: September 21, 2018NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: September 21, 2018COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS
Date: September 21, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 26, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 27, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: January 07, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 08, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: January 10, 2019Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: January 10, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 25, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: March 11, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 12, 2019Notice of Related Case
Date: March 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 03/22/2019
Date: March 22, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: April 10, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER
Date: April 12, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: April 12, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: April 18, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: April 18, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: April 25, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: April 29, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION)
Date: May 09, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: May 01, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: June 05, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 21, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: June 07, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF SEAN CRANDALL RE OSC RE FAILURE TO APPEAR
Date: July 02, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: June 20, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 02, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 10, 2020Motion to Transfer
Date: February 28, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 20, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER
Date: April 01, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF MBR ISO OPP TO MTN TO TRANSFER
Date: April 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 14, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020
Date: April 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 20, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: July 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT)
Date: November 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT)
Date: January 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT)
Date: February 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT)
Date: March 24, 2021Declaration re: Attorney's Fees
Date: April 14, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS’ FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES
Date: April 14, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 14, 2021Exhibit List
Date: April 14, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF DONNA HOOPER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY
Date: May 03, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: August 17, 2021Notice of Appearance Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to the Third, ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike; Filed by: Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer; Filed by: Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Transfer; Filed by: Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Declaration OF SEAN CRANDALL RE OSC RE FAILURE TO APPEAR; Filed by: Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Declaration of MBR ISO Opp to Mtn to Transfer; Filed by: Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Declaration of Donna Hooper in support of Plaintiff's Reply; Filed by: Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Motion to Transfer; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint for Violations of Statutory Obligations Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Demurrer) Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Donna Hooper in support of Plaintiff's Reply) Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Transfer; Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Following Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Declaration ( OF SEAN CRANDALL RE OSC RE FAILURE TO APPEAR) Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Following Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion to Strike) Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Transfer) Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: August 17, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions against plaintiff for failu...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Order to Show Cause Re: ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER) Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Following Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Following Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Following Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: August 11, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Declaration (of MBR ISO Opp to Mtn to Transfer) Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Motion to Transfer Filed by Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Michele Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Following Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (Punitive Damages In Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Reply (in Support of its Motion to Strike Punitive Damages in Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulated Proposed Protective Order; Exhibit "1")
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint for Violations of Statutory Obligations
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 04/29/2019)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 03/22/2019)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Declaration ( OF SEAN CRANDALL RE OSC RE FAILURE TO APPEAR)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions against plaintiff for failu...))
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of 03/22/2019)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Amended Complaint (SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS)
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Declaration (of MBR ISO Opp to Mtn to Transfer)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/14/2020)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to the Third, ...))
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Transfer)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Demurrer)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC.?S MOTION HEARING FOR MANDATORY VENUE TRANSFER)
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration))
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Following Settlement))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Order to Show Cause Re: ...))
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Transfer; Trial Setting Conference) of 07/10/2020)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Raue)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Following Settlement))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Following Settlement))
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Following Settlement))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Donna Hooper in support of Plaintiff's Reply)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fess, Costs, and Expenses)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Following Settlement))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice (OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS? FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Response (Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Evidentiary Objections)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)])
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Transfer; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: May 10, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: May 14, 2021Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: May 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT)
Date: August 11, 2021Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Motion to Transfer
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.