Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Stotts Heather C., filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Gross Jared Eli, against Ledesma Artt, Ledesma Renee, Nally Walter Jr Doe 11, Olympic Coldwell Banker, represented by Bell Terry, Bell Terry Harold, Gattas Martin S, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaura A. Seigle Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions271 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE
Date: September 14, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: September 14, 2018Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: November 27, 2018COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: September 14, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 18, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: April 18, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: May 20, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 20, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 20, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: June 12, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: June 12, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 12, 2019Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: June 14, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 14, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 02, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: August 02, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: February 18, 2020Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION SUPP. DEC. IN SUPPORT
Date: February 18, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE TO DISMISS
Date: February 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR MOTION TO DISMISS THE COM...)
Date: February 20, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: February 25, 2020Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOT. TO DISMISS
Date: February 26, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 27, 2020Order - Dismissal
Date: February 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS)
Date: February 28, 2020Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 03, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: March 05, 2020Summons - 1ST AMENDED SUMMONS
Date: March 11, 2020Answer
Date: May 11, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 23, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MARTIN S. GATTAS
Date: July 08, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 10, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MARTIN S. GATTAS
Date: July 13, 2020Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: July 13, 2020Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: July 13, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: July 22, 2020Proof of Service - No Service
Date: August 25, 2020Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE
Date: August 25, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION)
Date: August 26, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: August 26, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS TO DEFENDANT...)
Date: September 18, 2020Objection - OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANT ARTT & RENEE LEDESMA
Date: September 23, 2020Objection - OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANT WALTER NALLY, JR
Date: September 23, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION IN RESPONSE TO EVIDENCE OBJECTIONS BY PLAINTIFF
Date: September 24, 2020Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL
Date: September 24, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 24, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 25, 2020Joinder
Date: September 25, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NUMBER CHANGE
Date: September 25, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION)
Date: September 28, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: October 13, 2020Notice - NOTICE NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER
Date: October 07, 2020Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: October 13, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 13, 2020Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal
Date: November 30, 2020Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: April 06, 2021Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: April 14, 2021Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: April 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: April 26, 2021Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: April 28, 2021Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: June 21, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: June 07, 2021Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B312929
Date: November 04, 2021Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for motion to dismiss the com...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Trial, in ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Heather C. Stotts (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (supp. dec. in support) Filed by Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:001st Amended Summons Filed by Heather C. Stotts (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Heather C. Stotts (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Opposition (to motion to dismiss) Filed by Heather C. Stotts (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte to Dismiss) Filed by Heather C. Stotts (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (B312929, NA; PER 8.140(b)) Filed by Clerk
Date: August 31, 2021Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B312929) Filed by Clerk
Date: November 04, 2021Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Artt Ledesma (Defendant); Renee Ledesma (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Heather C. Stotts (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Advancing Hearin...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service Filed by Heather C. Stotts (Plaintiff); Artt Ledesma (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Artt Ledesma (Defendant); Renee Ledesma (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Joinder Filed by Walter Nally, Jr (DOE 11) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Artt Ledesma (Defendant); Renee Ledesma (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order Re Motion to Dismiss for Delay in Prosecu...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted Filed by Walter Nally, Jr (DOE 11) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss for Delay in Prosecution)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by Heather C. Stotts (Appellant)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Objection (to evidence submitted by Defendant Walter Nally, JR) Filed by Heather C. Stotts (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss for Delay in Prosecution)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Artt Ledesma (Defendant); Renee Ledesma (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal Filed by Heather C. Stotts (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Matter taken under submission as to Defendant...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Walter Nally, Jr (DOE 11) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Heather C. Stotts (Appellant)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) Filed by Artt Ledesma (Defendant); Renee Ledesma (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Number Change) Filed by Heather C. Stotts (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Of Martin S. Gattas) Filed by Walter Nally, Jr (DOE 11) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Walter Nally, Jr (DOE 11) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Dismiss for Delay in Prosecution) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Artt Ledesma (Defendant); Renee Ledesma (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Declaration ( of Demurring in Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (supp. dec. in support)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte to Dismiss)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Mot. to Dismiss)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Trial, in ...))
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Opposition (to motion to dismiss)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted))
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for motion to dismiss the com...))
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss))
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Advancing Hearin...))
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Setting of Motion Pursuant to Emergency Order ...))
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Reply (Defendant Walter Nally, Jr. Reply Brief In Support Of Motion To Dismiss For Delay In Prosecution)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (of Martin S. Gattas)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Objection (to evidence submitted by Defendant Walter Nally, JR)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Number Change)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Of Martin S. Gattas)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Dismissal)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Opposition (in response to evidence objections by plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Of Martin S. Gattas)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:001st Amended Summons
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Objection (to evidence submitted by Defendant Artt & Renee Ledesma)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Matter taken under submission as to Defendant...))
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Delay in Prosecution and Related Joinder)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte to Advance time for Hearing Motions to Compel Discovery)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss for Delay in Prosecution))
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice of Lodgment of Proof of Service of Notice)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Judgment ([Proposed] Entry of Judgment After Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order Re Motion to Dismiss for Delay in Prosecu...))
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss for Delay in Prosecution))
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Dismiss for Delay in Prosecution) of 09/28/2020)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Withdrawal of Intention to Move to set aside and vacate dismissal)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Reply (Reply to opposition motion for attorney fees)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Declaration Declaration Of Martin S. Gattas; Filed by: Walter Nally, Jr (DOE 11) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Opposition to motion to dismiss; Filed by: Heather C. Stotts (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Reply Reply to Opposition to Mot. to Dismiss; Filed by: Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Walter Nally, Jr (DOE 11) (Defendant); As to: Heather C. Stotts (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Declaration Declaration Of Martin S. Gattas; Filed by: Walter Nally, Jr (DOE 11) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss for Delay in Prosecution) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Joinder; Filed by: Walter Nally, Jr (DOE 11) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Objection to evidence submitted by Defendant Walter Nally, JR; Filed by: Heather C. Stotts (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Artt Ledesma (Defendant); Renee Ledesma (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration supp. dec. in support; Filed by: Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B312929; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 04, 2021Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Walter Nally, Jr (DOE 11) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Opposition to Ex Parte to Dismiss; Filed by: Heather C. Stotts (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal; Filed by: Heather C. Stotts (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Heather C. Stotts (Appellant)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal B312929, NA; PER 8.140(b); Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 31, 2021Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Artt Ledesma (Defendant); Renee Ledesma (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: Artt Ledesma (Defendant); Renee Ledesma (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Artt Ledesma (Defendant); Renee Ledesma (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Mot. to Dismiss) Filed by Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Of Martin S. Gattas) Filed by Walter Nally, Jr (DOE 11) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Setting of Motion Pursuant to Emergency Order ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Court
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Answer Filed by Walter Nally, Jr (DOE 11) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by Heather C. Stotts (Plaintiff); Heather C. Stotts (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss Filed by Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Artt Ledesma (Defendant); Renee Ledesma (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted Filed by Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Heather C. Stotts (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss Filed by Artt Ledesma (Defendant); Renee Ledesma (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Coldwell Banker Olympic (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.