Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Shon Indai, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Hofman Richard, Marh David T., against Acy Global Inc., Shin Mi Hye, Yoo Suk Jong Aka Andrew Lee Aka Andrew Yoo, represented by Prado Nicole C., Samini Bobby, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Monica Bachner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMonica Bachner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management142 days |
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions541 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Indai Shon (Plaintiff); As to: Acy Global Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Mi Hye Shin (Defendant); Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Stipulation to Continue Post-Mediation Status Conference; Filed by: Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Mi Hye Shin (Defendant); Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Objection Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's Notice of Errata; Filed by: Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Opposition TO DEMURRER; Filed by: Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Brief ERRATA TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Reply ISO of Demurrer to Pltf.'s Second Amended Complaint; Filed by: Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Mi Hye Shin (Defendant); Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Mi Hye Shin (Defendant); Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant); As to: Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE - IC
Date: September 17, 2018COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT: PROMISSORY NOTE AND SHAREHOLDER'S AGREEMENT ETC....
Date: September 17, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 25, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: September 27, 2018Notice - Notice OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 15, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 06, 2019Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 02, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: April 04, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: May 14, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 20, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 20, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 23, 2019Proof of Service - No Service
Date: July 01, 2019Reply - REPLY DEFT.'S REPLY ISO OF DEMURRER TO PLTF.'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 26, 2019Order - RULING
Date: September 13, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANTS SUK JONG YOO AKA ANDREW LEE AKA ANDREW ...)
Date: September 13, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: October 11, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: October 18, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: October 31, 2019Proof of Service - No Service
Date: November 12, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 07, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 13, 2020Brief - BRIEF ERRATA TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 21, 2020Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: February 21, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO CONTINUE POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: February 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE POST-MEDIATION STATUS...)
Date: February 21, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: February 26, 2020Reply - REPLY ISO OF DEMURRER TO PLTF.'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: March 11, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: March 11, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 18, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/03/2020
Date: April 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 03, 2020Brief - BRIEF ERRATA TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 07, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 18, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 02, 2020Answer
Date: July 30, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: July 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: August 25, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF RULING AT POST- MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 25, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: December 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: February 26, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: April 12, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: April 13, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Mi Hye Shin (Defendant); Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff); Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Mi Hye Shin (Defendant); Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by Mi Hye Shin (Defendant); Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Brief (ERRATA TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- NOT ENTERED) Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Mi Hye Shin (Defendant); Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:003rd Amended Complaint Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff); Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Mi Hye Shin (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: April 13, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Stipulation to Continue Post-Mediation Status Conference Filed by Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Ruling Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd) Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff); Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED ...))
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE))
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should not be Imposed f...))
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY $150.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FO...))
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Hayk Grigoryan Re: Failure to Appear)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/03/2020)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Brief (ERRATA TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Defendants' Responsive Pleading deadline by 30 Days
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Stipulation to Continue Post-Mediation Status Conference
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Reclassification
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation to Continue Post-Mediation Status...))
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline by 45 Days
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEMURRER)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Ruling
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Objection (Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's Notice of Errata)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants Suk Jong Yoo aka Andrew Lee aka Andrew ...))
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation and [proposed] order to extend de...))
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Reply (ISO of Demurrer to Pltf.'s Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:003rd Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Reply (Deft.'s Reply ISO of Demurrer to Pltf.'s First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00ERRATA TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00[Proposed] Order to Continue Post Mediation Status Conference
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend De...))
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING AT POST- MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- NOT ENTERED)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 02/26/2021)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Hayk Grigoryan Re: Failure to Appear; Filed by: Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Mi Hye Shin (Defendant); Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Brief ERRATA TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Indai Shon (Plaintiff); As to: Acy Global Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Mi Hye Shin (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mi Hye Shin (Defendant); Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Complaint (1st) Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Hayk Grigoryan Re: Failure to Appear) Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00[Proposed] Order to Continue Post Mediation Status Conference Filed by Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Mi Hye Shin (Defendant); Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants Suk Jong Yoo aka Andrew Lee aka Andrew ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should not be Imposed f...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Mi Hye Shin (Defendant); Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Mi Hye Shin (Defendant); Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Reply (ISO of Demurrer to Pltf.'s Second Amended Complaint) Filed by Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY $150.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FO...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation to Continue Post-Mediation Status...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Mi Hye Shin (Defendant); Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend De...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Amended Complaint Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff); Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEMURRER) Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Objection (Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's Notice of Errata) Filed by Suk Jong Yoo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation and [proposed] order to extend de...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00ERRATA TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT Filed by Indai Shon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Reclassification Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.