Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jeong Young Chai, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Yoo Kenneth Keebyung Esq., against Hertz Vehicles Llc, Jamieson Bradford, Jamieson Myles, represented by O'Connor Robert John Esq., Woods Delmas A Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions140 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES
Date: September 11, 2018NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: September 11, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 24, 2018Answer - General Denial
Date: October 19, 2018Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: October 19, 2018Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: January 03, 2019Declaration - Declaration Attorney Declaration
Date: January 03, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))
Date: January 29, 2019Answer
Date: May 22, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: July 03, 2019Demand for Jury Trial
Date: July 12, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 23, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 06, 2019Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: November 21, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: May 20, 2020Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: June 03, 2020Answer
Date: June 22, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: November 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DEFENDANT HERTZ, VE...)
Date: November 30, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: April 05, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Hertz Vehicles LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Myles Jamieson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Young Chai Jeong (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Hertz Vehicles LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Young Chai Jeong (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Hertz Vehicles LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant, He...)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Myles Jamieson (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00General Denial; Filed by: Myles Jamieson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Myles Jamieson (Defendant); As to: Young Chai Jeong (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Hertz Vehicles LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Declaration Attorney Declaration; Filed by: Hertz Vehicles LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Myles Jamieson (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Bradford Jamieson (Defendant); As to: Young Chai Jeong (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Myles Jamieson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Hertz Vehicles LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Bankruptcy Filed by...)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Hertz Vehicles LLC (Defendant); As to: Young Chai Jeong (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Myles Jamieson (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Young Chai Jeong (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Myles Jamieson (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Bankruptcy Filed by...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Young Chai Jeong (Plaintiff)
Date: April 05, 2021Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy Filed by Defendant Hertz, Ve...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant, He...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy Filed by Defendant Hertz, Ve...)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00General Denial Filed by Myles Jamieson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Answer Filed by Bradford Jamieson (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Answer Filed by Hertz Vehicles LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Young Chai Jeong (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Declaration (Attorney Declaration) Filed by Hertz Vehicles LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) Filed by Hertz Vehicles LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Young Chai Jeong (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Myles Jamieson (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Defendant Hertz's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant, He...))
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Bankruptcy Filed by...))
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Notice (Notice Of Non Opposition To Defendant Hertz Vehicles LLCs Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Declaration (Attorney Declaration)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.