Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bernal Sandra, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Adamsky Lawrence P., Davis Jeffrey Robert, Schwartz Jeffrey Marc, Hull Ann A., Hull Ann A. Esq., (total of 5) See All against Allahyarian Antonio, Arconic Inc., Arconic Valley-Todeco Inc., Calderas Maria, Sarkissian Armen, (total of 6) See All represented by Lecrone John Prescott, Petrofsky Melissa Ann, Riaz Jibraun, Wang Lorraine, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gregory W. Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management189 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: November 15, 2021Order (granting mtn for atty fees in part)
Date: September 01, 2021NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE - IC
Date: September 14, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: September 14, 2018JURY TRIAL DEMANDED ETC....
Date: September 14, 2018PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER
Date: September 26, 2018Minute Order -
Date: October 01, 2018Legacy Document -
Date: October 04, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service -
Date: October 12, 2018Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: October 23, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: October 29, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: October 29, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: November 06, 2018Answer
Date: November 06, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)
Date: January 23, 2019Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order - Confidential Designation Only
Date: January 23, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 30, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 26, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: March 07, 2019Notice - Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 07, 2019Answer
Date: July 02, 2019Association of Attorney
Date: August 15, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: December 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT - VOL. 2 OF 3
Date: December 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT - VOL. 3 OF 3
Date: December 05, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 05, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 05, 2019Separate Statement
Date: December 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT- VOL. 1 OF 3
Date: December 05, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 06, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 10, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MSJ AND TRIAL
Date: February 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MSJ A...)
Date: February 04, 2020Response - RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT PART 2 FILED BY SANDRA BERNAL
Date: February 05, 2020Memorandum - MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 05, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF SANDRA BERNAL IN OPPOSITION TO MSJ
Date: February 05, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANN A. HULL IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MSJ
Date: February 06, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 06, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 14, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF JIBRAUN RIAZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE
Date: February 14, 2020Objection - OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF SANDRA BERNAL
Date: February 14, 2020Reply - REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 14, 2020Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF ANN HULL
Date: February 14, 2020Motion to Continue - MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MSJ
Date: February 18, 2020Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: February 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: February 19, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL
Date: March 09, 2020Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: March 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: March 16, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 18, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: March 20, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 15, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION ISO MOTION TO QUASH
Date: June 12, 2020Separate Statement
Date: June 12, 2020Motion to Quash
Date: June 12, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING OF HEARING)
Date: June 17, 2020Order - ORDER CONTINUING MTN TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND MSJ IS MOOT
Date: July 01, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: July 17, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION ISO OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: July 13, 2020Motion for Protective Order
Date: July 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA)
Date: July 31, 2020Order - ORDER GRANTING REOPENING DISCOVERY AND GRANTING MTN TO QUASH
Date: August 27, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: September 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: October 13, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION RE DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: January 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: January 19, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: January 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: April 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: January 28, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: February 09, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 16, 2022Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript
Date: February 18, 2022Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING
Date: March 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: April 25, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: July 12, 2022Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Reply ( to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (- Confidential Designation Only)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Notice (by Defendant of Intent to Appear Telephonically at Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Declaration (Compendium of Evidence in Support - Vol. 3 of 3)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Declaration ( of Ann A. Hull In Opposition to Defendants MSJ)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice (Defendant's Notice of Court Ruling Regarding Stipulation and Protective Order)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing on MSJ a...))
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of )
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Order Continuing Trial)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Objection (to the Declaration of Sandra Bernal)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Memorandum (in opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Hearing on MSJ and Trial)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Declaration of Mailing
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference Matter is called for hearing.))
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Declaration ( of Sandra Bernal in Opposition to MSJ)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference Matter is called for hearing.))
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Declaration (Compendium of Evidence in Support - Vol. 2 of 3)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Jibraun Riaz In Support of Defendants' Objections to Evidence)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Motion to Continue (Hearing on MSJ)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Ann Hull)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Response (to Separate Statement Part 2 filed by Sandra Bernal)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Declaration (Compendium of Evidence in Support- Vol. 1 of 3)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Setting of Hearing) of )
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Motion to Quash)
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Jibraun Riaz ISO Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (re Defendants' Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena))
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial; Hearing on Motion to Con...))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Setting of Hearing))
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Order (continuing mtn to continue trial and MSJ is moot)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Order (granting reopening discovery and granting mtn to quash)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - *cont'd from *;...))
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR ORDER CONTINUING DISCOVERY)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings to Continue Trial))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Jibraun Riaz ISO Motion for Protective Order re Depo of Juan Uribe)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Order (granting mtn for atty fees in part)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Ana Pardon In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings to Continue Mtn for Attorneys' Fees))
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ex-Parte Proceedings to Continue Mtn for Attorneys' Fees) of )
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: April 15, 2022Declaration (of Jibraun Riaz in support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (Of Hearing)
Date: March 03, 2022Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript
Date: February 18, 2022Opposition (to Motion for Attorney's Fees)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 10/29/2018)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 01/23/2019)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (- Confidential Designation Only)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Notice (Defendant's Notice of Court Ruling Regarding Stipulation and Protective Order)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Notice (by Defendant of Intent to Appear Telephonically at Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference Matter is called for hearing.))
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference Matter is called for hearing.))
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Declaration (Compendium of Evidence in Support - Vol. 3 of 3)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Declaration (Compendium of Evidence in Support - Vol. 2 of 3)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Declaration (Compendium of Evidence in Support- Vol. 1 of 3)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing on MSJ a...))
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Declaration ( of Sandra Bernal in Opposition to MSJ)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Memorandum (in opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Hearing on MSJ and Trial)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Response (to Separate Statement Part 2 filed by Sandra Bernal)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Declaration ( of Ann A. Hull In Opposition to Defendants MSJ)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Objection (to the Declaration of Sandra Bernal)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Motion to Continue (Hearing on MSJ)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Ann Hull)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Jibraun Riaz In Support of Defendants' Objections to Evidence)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Order Continuing Trial)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Reply ( to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/16/2020)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Setting of Hearing) of 06/17/2020)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Setting of Hearing))
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Motion to Quash)
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Order (continuing mtn to continue trial and MSJ is moot)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial; Hearing on Motion to Con...))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena))
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Declaration (of Jibraun Riaz ISO Motion for Protective Order re Depo of Juan Uribe)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR ORDER CONTINUING DISCOVERY)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - *cont'd from 07/01/20*;...))
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Order (granting reopening discovery and granting mtn to quash)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (re Defendants' Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings to Continue Trial))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Jibraun Riaz ISO Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ex-Parte Proceedings to Continue Mtn for Attorneys' Fees) of 06/23/2021)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings to Continue Mtn for Attorneys' Fees))
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Jibraun Riaz in support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/01/2021)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Attorney's Fees)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Ana Pardon In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: June 11, 2021Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: June 11, 2021Declaration re: Attorney's Fees
Date: June 17, 2021Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: June 17, 2021Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: June 22, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: June 24, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: August 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: August 31, 2021Order - ORDER GRANTING MTN FOR ATTY FEES IN PART
Date: September 01, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 09/01/2021
Date: September 01, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: September 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: September 01, 2021Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: October 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: October 29, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: November 08, 2021Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: November 15, 2021Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: January 06, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 25, 2022Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.