Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Figueroa Angela, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ambarchyan Romel, against Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Gutierrez Arnoldo, Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Nationstar Mortgage Llc, Quality Loan Service Corporation, (total of 5) See All represented by Balser Justin D., Duong Le T., Marks Richard D., Baumann Katalina, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth Allen White presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Allen White Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management187 days |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Ex-parte Request for Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: August 29, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 11, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 12, 2018Proof of Service -
Date: September 18, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 18, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 19, 2018JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND RELATED DATES
Date: September 19, 2018ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND RELATED DATES
Date: September 19, 2018QUALITY'S DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS
Date: September 27, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: September 27, 2018NOTICE OF QUALITY'S DECLARATION OF NONMONETARY STATUS; ETC.
Date: September 27, 2018Proof of Service -
Date: September 27, 2018Response - RESPONSE TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: October 31, 2018Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: November 16, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: November 19, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 12, 2018Other - - Other - Tentative decision on Application for Preliminary Injunction
Date: January 22, 2019Reply - Reply in support application for preliminary injunction
Date: January 22, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction)
Date: January 22, 2019Answer
Date: January 22, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 23, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 25, 2019Order - Order Temporary Restraining Order and OSC re Prelim Injunc
Date: January 28, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 30, 2019Notice - Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Or Order
Date: February 01, 2019Notice - Notice Of Continuance Of Case Management Conference
Date: February 01, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 01, 2019Notice of Related Case
Date: February 06, 2019Notice - Notice Of Posting Civil Cash Bond
Date: February 07, 2019Other - - Other - Decision on application for preliminary injunction: granted
Date: February 19, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction as to Arnoldo ...)
Date: February 19, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: February 20, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: February 27, 2019Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: March 06, 2019Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND
Date: March 20, 2019Notice - PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND
Date: April 19, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND
Date: May 20, 2019Declaration re: Attorney's Fees
Date: May 30, 2019Motion for Attorney Fees - MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS
Date: May 30, 2019Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND
Date: June 18, 2019Other - - OTHER - COURT'S RULING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS
Date: June 27, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: June 28, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF TUAN V. UONG
Date: July 12, 2019Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND
Date: July 19, 2019Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND
Date: August 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: September 06, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 09, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL
Date: September 10, 2019Notice - NOTICE DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST BY DEFENDANT ARNOLDO GUTIERREZ
Date: September 10, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND
Date: September 19, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND
Date: October 18, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND
Date: November 15, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: October 23, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: November 22, 2019Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: November 27, 2019Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: December 03, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND
Date: December 17, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: January 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 13, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND
Date: January 16, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER:)
Date: March 20, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER:) OF 03/20/2020
Date: March 20, 2020Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS
Date: April 17, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: June 04, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: July 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: July 27, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING
Date: July 29, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: August 04, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: July 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: August 05, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF SETTING TRIAL DATE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 14, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO RELEASE BOND PAYMENTS
Date: August 31, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: October 29, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROPOSED ORDER
Date: August 31, 2021Order - ORDER (PROPOSED) ORDER GRANTING AMENDED ORDER TO RELEASE BOND PAYMENTS
Date: November 22, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 14, 2022Ex-parte Request for Order
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Other - Tentative decision on Application for Preliminary Injunction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Document:Ex-parte Request for Order Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Arnoldo Gutierrez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Other - Decision on application for preliminary injunction: granted; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Arnoldo Gutierrez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Other - court's ruling on motion for attorneys' fees and costs; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff); As to: Arnoldo Gutierrez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff); As to: Arnoldo Gutierrez (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Reply in support application for preliminary injunction; Filed by: Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Arnoldo Gutierrez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs; Filed by: Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Arnoldo Gutierrez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Arnoldo Gutierrez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by Arnoldo Gutierrez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Notice Filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Other - (Tentative decision on Application for Preliminary Injunction) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Arnoldo Gutierrez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Arnoldo Gutierrez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees (and Costs) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Notice (Of Posting Civil Cash Bond) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Notice (Of Entry Of Judgment Or Order) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Arnoldo Gutierrez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Other - (Decision on application for preliminary injunction: granted) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction as to Arnoldo ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Notice (Of Continuance Of Case Management Conference) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Reply (in support application for preliminary injunction) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION OF PLAINTIFF, ANGELA FIGUEROA, FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by Arnoldo Gutierrez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Civil Cash Bond) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order:) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order:)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff?s Notice of Posting Civil Cash Bond) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED HEARING) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Other - (court's ruling on motion for attorneys' fees and costs) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Notice (Disclaimer of Interest by Defendant Arnoldo Gutierrez) Filed by Arnoldo Gutierrez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Civil Cash Bond) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by Arnoldo Gutierrez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND) Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-29 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Response (to Verified Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Response (to osc and opposition to osc re prelim injunction)
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Reply (in support application for preliminary injunction)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of Defendants Nationstar)
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Other - (Tentative decision on Application for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Angela Figueroa in support of reply to application for preliminary injunction)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction))
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue the January 31, 2019 Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Order (Temporary Restraining Order and OSC re Prelim Injunc)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Notice (Of Entry Of Judgment Or Order)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Notice (Of Continuance Of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Other - (Decision on application for preliminary injunction: granted)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Declaration (OF ARNOLD GUTIERREZ REGARDING LOSS SHOULD PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BE ISSUED)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Notice (Of Posting Civil Cash Bond)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction as to Arnoldo ...))
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case) of 02/27/2019)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case))
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees (and Costs)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Other - (court's ruling on motion for attorneys' fees and costs)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order:))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Civil Cash Bond)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Motion re: (Set Aside Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Request for Sanctions)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff?s Notice of Posting Civil Cash Bond)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Notice (Disclaimer of Interest by Defendant Arnoldo Gutierrez)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Civil Cash Bond)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Tuan V. Uong)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING CIVIL CASH BOND)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION OF PLAINTIFF, ANGELA FIGUEROA, FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND...))
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order:) of 03/20/2020)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Arnoldo Gutierrez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Filed by:
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order:) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Angela Figueroa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED HEARING)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice (Of Setting Trial Date And Final Status Conference)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.