Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ppr Cs Manager Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Stalwart Law Group, against Kr Hollywood Llc, represented by Schilling Linda Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Randolph M. Hammock presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandolph M. Hammock Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 22, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time167 days |
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: August 22, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: August 22, 2018COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF
Date: August 22, 2018EXHIBIT A TO THE DECLARATION OF BRAD KORZEN (THE CONFIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT AGREEMENT)
Date: August 23, 2018KR HOLLYWOOD, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: August 23, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 23, 2018ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE
Date: August 23, 2018TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: August 23, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: August 24, 2018NOTICE OF RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: August 27, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 29, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 31, 2018DECLARATION OF DAVID SIMON IN SUPPORT OF KR HOLLYWOOD, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 06, 2018KR HOLLYWOOD, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: September 06, 2018DECLARATION OF STEPHEN ROSETTA IN SUPPORT OF KR HOLLYWOOD, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 06, 2018DECLARATION OF TONY KATHOL IN SUPPORT OF KR HOLLYWOOD, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 06, 2018DECLARATION OF JEFFREY HAW KEN IN SUPPORT OF KR HOLLYWOOD, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 06, 2018PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 11, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: September 11, 2018DECISION ON APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: September 13, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 13, 2018JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 27, 2018ORDER GRANTTNG JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 27, 2018Notice - Notice Of Case Management Conference
Date: October 19, 2018Stipulation - No Order - Stipulation to stay case pending arbitration
Date: October 26, 2018Order - Order Granting Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Arbitration
Date: October 26, 2018Request for Refund / Order - Request for Refund / Order (Approved)
Date: November 16, 2018Request for Refund / Order
Date: November 29, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: February 05, 2019Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Stipulation to stay case pending arbitration; Filed by: PPR CS Manager, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order (Approved); Filed by: KR Hollywood, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: PPR CS Manager, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: February 05, 2019Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: KR Hollywood, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Order Granting Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Arbitration; Filed by: PPR CS Manager, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Order Filed by PPR CS Manager, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Notice (Of Case Management Conference) Filed by PPR CS Manager, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by PPR CS Manager, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order Filed by KR Hollywood, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by PPR CS Manager, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by KR Hollywood, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Notice Filed by KR Hollywood, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by PPR CS Manager, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order ((Approved)) Filed by KR Hollywood, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by PPR CS Manager, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by PPR CS Manager, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (to stay case pending arbitration) Filed by PPR CS Manager, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Order (Granting Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Arbitration) Filed by PPR CS Manager, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Declaration Filed by KR Hollywood, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Order Filed by KR Hollywood, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by KR Hollywood, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Declaration Filed by KR Hollywood, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Stipulation Filed by KR Hollywood, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by PPR CS Manager, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: February 05, 2019Reply/Response Filed by PPR CS Manager, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by PPR CS Manager, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Order Filed by PPR CS Manager, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Order (Granting Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Arbitration)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Complaint Filed by PPR CS Manager, Inc. (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: February 05, 2019Stipulation
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order ((Approved))
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (to stay case pending arbitration)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Notice (Of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.