Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Morse Beverly K., Trustee Of The Beverly K. Morse Trust, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Graham Richard Steven, against Marbury Clinton, Zamora Abby, Zamora Sebastian, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Robert B. Broadbelt presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management77 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2018 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Residential (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions42 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time159 days |
Answer UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Claim of Right to Possession Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Document:Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by: Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Document:Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by: Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Document:Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by: Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Answer Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: SEBASTIAN ZAMORA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Beverly K. Morse (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by First-Class Mail; Filed by: SEBASTIAN ZAMORA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order (Non-Appearance);) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Judgment - Unlawful Detainer By Court, After Court Trial, Defendant Did Not Appear at Trial; Filed by:
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: SEBASTIAN ZAMORA (Defendant); As to: Beverly K. Morse (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Document:Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Document:Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by: Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order (Non-Appearance);) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-04T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: SEBASTIAN ZAMORA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Abby Zamora; On the Complaint filed by BEVERLY K MORSE ET AL on
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings; Filed by: SEBASTIAN ZAMORA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: SEBASTIAN ZAMORA (Defendant); As to: Beverly K. Morse (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: August 16, 2018COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER -
Date: August 16, 2018SUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER -
Date: August 16, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER
Date: August 21, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL
Date: August 21, 2018ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER
Date: August 21, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER
Date: August 22, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL
Date: August 22, 2018ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -
Date: August 22, 2018APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER
Date: August 23, 2018PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION
Date: August 27, 2018ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER
Date: August 27, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL
Date: August 27, 2018NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: August 27, 2018NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE
Date: September 04, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE
Date: September 11, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2018OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF TO DEMURRER; CORRECT NOTICE OF DEMURRER HEARING DATE, TIME AND LOCATION
Date: September 20, 2018NOTICE OF REJECTION - ORDER TO POST UNLAWFUL DETAINER
Date: September 24, 2018ORDER RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 27, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 27, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE: PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 01, 2018NOTICE OF RUIJING ON DEMURRER; NOTICE OF 11/1/2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 01, 2018Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -
Date: October 03, 2018Proof of Service by Mail -
Date: October 03, 2018Answer - ANSWER UNLAWFUL DETAINER
Date: October 03, 2018Answer - Answer Unlawful Detainer
Date: October 03, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 10, 2018Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: October 24, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)
Date: November 01, 2018Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial -
Date: November 01, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 02, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: November 02, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order (Non-Appearance);)
Date: November 02, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order (Non-Appearance);)
Date: November 04, 2018Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail re: Notice of Stay of Proceedings
Date: November 13, 2018Notice - Notice of Stay of Proceedings
Date: November 13, 2018Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: November 15, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service by First-Class Mail
Date: December 07, 2018Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: December 07, 2018Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: December 12, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial Unlawful Detainer (2.5 hours estimate);)
Date: December 12, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 12, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference;)
Date: December 18, 2018Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: January 08, 2019Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: January 28, 2019Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale
Date: January 28, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 28, 2019Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: February 04, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 04, 2019Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: February 04, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Judgment;)
Date: March 06, 2019Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: March 14, 2019Writ - Return
Date: April 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY)
Date: June 05, 2019Complaint
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Application
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Claim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order (Non-Appearance);))
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Proof of service by first -class mail-- civil
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (of Notice of Case Management Conference & OSC Re: Proof of Service)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Answer (Unlawful Detainer)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (re: Notice of Stay of Proceedings)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Demurrer; Notice of 11/1/2018 Case Management Conference)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order (Non-Appearance);) of 11/04/2018)
Date: 2018-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order (Non-Appearance);))
Date: 2018-11-04T00:00:00Notice (of Stay of Proceedings)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order (Non-Appearance);) of 11/02/2018)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial Unlawful Detainer (2.5 hours estimate); Order ...))
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference;))
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Judgment;))
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Jury Trial Unlawful Detainer (2.5 hours estimate);))
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by First-Class Mail
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Writ of Possession
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Robert B. Broadbelt |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Robert B. Broadbelt |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Robert B. Broadbelt |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Robert B. Broadbelt |
|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Robert B. Broadbelt |
|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Robert B. Broadbelt |
|
June 05, 2019 | Hearing | Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court | |
June 05, 2019 | Hearing | On the Court's own motion, Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Robert B. Broadbelt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.