Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hanna Nabil Aziz, Sarabia Omar, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by J. Kim Elaine, against Hanna Nabil Aziz, Maldonado Gilbert, represented by Kalpakian Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 17, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint -
Date: August 17, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: August 17, 2018Summons -
Date: August 17, 2018Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service Of Summons
Date: December 10, 2018Answer
Date: June 28, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: June 28, 2019Demand for Jury Trial
Date: June 28, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 28, 2019Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: November 01, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2019Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT GILBERT MALDONADO'S MOTION TO DISMI...)
Date: February 10, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: June 22, 2020Motion for Sanctions
Date: September 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: September 01, 2020Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: September 29, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT MALDONADO'S MOTION FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS
Date: November 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: December 09, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION HANNA'S OPPOSITION TO MALDONADO'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GFS
Date: January 13, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: December 17, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: February 02, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: September 13, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: May 05, 2022Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant/Cross-Defendant Gilbert Maldonado's Motion to Dismi...))
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Cross-Complainant's Opposition to Cross-Defendants Motion for Monetary Sanctions)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Opposition (to Cross-Defendant Maldonado's Motion for Monetary Sanctions)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Opposition (Hanna's Opposition to Maldonado's Motion for Determination of GFS)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service (Of Summons)
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.