Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Arellano Miguel, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Gerber Karl, Gunther Brett Michael Esq., against Davich U.S.A. Inc., represented by Steinberg Craig S, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTeresa A. Beaudet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management118 days |
Filing DateAugust 14, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Davich U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Miguel Arellano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Davich U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Order re Plaintiff's ex parte to continue trial; Filed by:
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Opposition to Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial; Filed by: Davich U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Motion to Quash Notice of Deposition; Filed by: Davich U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Davich U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Order re ex parte application to vacate trial date and advance IDC; Filed by:
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Order re Chiu's Motion for Good Faith Settlement; Filed by:
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Davich U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Miguel Arellano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Declaration of Jung Mi Kim in Support; Filed by: Davich U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Davich U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Objection OF PLAINTIFF TO THE DECLARATION OF JUNG MI KIM; Filed by: Miguel Arellano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:001st Amended Complaint; Filed by: Miguel Arellano (Plaintiff); As to: Davich U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Order re Plaintiff's motion for leave to file FAC; Filed by:
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Objection OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF ARELLANO; Filed by: Davich U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Objection OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF DIAZ; Filed by: Davich U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Declaration of Craig Steinberg in Support; Filed by: Davich U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Order re MSJ; Filed by:
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Order re MSJ/MSA; Filed by:
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend; Filed by: Davich U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 31, 2022Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: August 14, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 20, 2018NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: August 14, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 29, 2018Notice - Notice OF POSTING JURY FEES
Date: November 30, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: August 14, 2018Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) -
Date: October 09, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: December 10, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: February 19, 2019Case Management Order
Date: February 25, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: February 25, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 01, 2019Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 01, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: September 23, 2019Order - ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE TRIAL DATE AND ADVANCE IDC
Date: October 23, 2019Informal Discovery Conference
Date: November 01, 2019Informal Discovery Conference
Date: November 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: November 05, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: December 17, 2019Order - ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: December 17, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE CURRENT TRIAL...)
Date: December 17, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: January 15, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH
Date: January 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH NOTICE OF DEPOSITION)
Date: February 05, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND
Date: February 13, 2020Order - ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FAC
Date: February 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND TO FILE THE FIRST AMENDE...)
Date: February 28, 2020Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 27, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 27, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG STEINBERG IN SUPPORT
Date: March 27, 2020Separate Statement
Date: March 27, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUNG MI KIM IN SUPPORT
Date: March 27, 2020Objection - OBJECTION OF PLAINTIFF TO THE DECLARATION OF JUNG MI KIM
Date: June 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 02, 2020Separate Statement
Date: June 02, 2020Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF DIAZ
Date: August 06, 2020Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF ARELLANO
Date: August 06, 2020Order - ORDER RE MSJ
Date: August 17, 2020Order - ORDER RE MSJ/MSA
Date: September 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUD...)
Date: September 15, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: October 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE LODGE TRIAL BINDERS)
Date: October 22, 2021Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: October 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: January 31, 2022Order - Dismissal
Date: January 31, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: May 17, 2023Complaint
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Notice of Deposition)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re whether to order MSC; Hearing on Ex Part...))
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY BRETT GUNTHER RE: SCHEDULING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re declaration re submission of MS...))
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE THE CURRENT TRIAL...))
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Motion re: (FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Notice of Deposition))
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion to Quash)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Leave to Amend)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend to file the First Amende...))
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Craig Steinberg in Support)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:001st Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/02/2020)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Objection (OF PLAINTIFF TO THE DECLARATION OF JUNG MI KIM)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Declaration (OF ANN GULESER IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Jung Mi Kim in Support)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Declaration (OF MIGUEL ARELLANO IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Declaration (OF JESSICA DIAZ IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S UNDISPUTED FACTS AND SUPPORTING EVIDENCE)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication; Trial Setting Con...))
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re whether to order 2nd MSC (Judge Ramona See)))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF DIAZ)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF ARELLANO)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjud...))
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT?S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Miguel Arellano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Davich U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.