Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
3800 West Sixth Street Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Daggenhurst Richard Geoffrey, Kim Steven Chul, against Lee Eun Chu, Lee Young Soon, Smiling Tree Corp., Smiling Tree Inc. Aka Smiling Tree Corp., represented by Barkin Steven Jacob Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Ernest M. Hiroshige presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErnest M. Hiroshige Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2018 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Commercial (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial68 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions116 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt Finding - After Court Trial |
Case Cycle Time97 days |
SUMMONS -
Date: August 02, 2018NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: August 02, 2018COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER
Date: August 02, 2018JURY DEMAND OF DEFENDANTS EUN CHU LEE AND SMILING TREE, INC. AKA SMILING TREE CORP.
Date: August 13, 2018NOTICE OF TRIAL (SHORT CAUSE)
Date: August 24, 2018NOTICE OF TRIAL (SHORT CAUSE)
Date: August 27, 2018NOTICE OF ADDRESS CORRECTION OF DEFENDANTS' ATTORNEY
Date: August 30, 2018NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: August 31, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service -
Date: October 01, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 05, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment -
Date: October 01, 2018NOTICE OF ERRATUM RE: EXECUTED SIGNATURE PAGE OF DECL. OF JOHN TAE KIM
Date: October 01, 2018Legacy Document -
Date: October 03, 2018Notice -
Date: October 12, 2018Motion in Limine -
Date: October 10, 2018Other - -
Date: October 12, 2018Trial Brief -
Date: October 12, 2018Statement of the Case -
Date: October 12, 2018Other - - Other - ruling re: motion for summary judgment
Date: October 18, 2018Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL / SHORT-CAUSE)
Date: October 18, 2018Trial Brief - Trial Brief Defendants' Trial Brief
Date: October 19, 2018Witness List - Witness List Defendants' witness List
Date: October 19, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial / Short-Cause)
Date: October 19, 2018Exhibit List - Exhibit List Defendants' Exhibit List
Date: October 19, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 19, 2018Notice - Notice of Association
Date: October 22, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial / Short-Cause)
Date: October 29, 2018Other - - Other - Plaintiff's Closing Argument (Opening)
Date: October 30, 2018Brief - Defendants' Closing Brief
Date: October 31, 2018Reply - Plaintiff's Closing Argument (Reply)
Date: November 01, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: November 05, 2018Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: November 07, 2018Other - - Other - Ruling on submitted matter
Date: November 06, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
Date: November 07, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: November 08, 2018Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: November 16, 2018Judgment - Unlawful Detainer
Date: November 26, 2018Motion for New Trial - Motion for New Trial Per CCP 657
Date: November 27, 2018Motion re: - Motion re: to Enter a New and Different Judgment
Date: November 27, 2018Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: November 27, 2018Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: November 30, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order
Date: November 28, 2018Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: November 30, 2018Opposition - Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For A New Trial Pursuant to CCP 657
Date: December 20, 2018Opposition - Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Attorneys Fees
Date: December 27, 2018Declaration - Declaration of Steven C. Kim
Date: December 27, 2018Notice - Notice Of Non-Receipt Of Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants Motion
Date: January 07, 2019Other - - Other - Tentative ruling re: defendant's motion for attorney's fees
Date: January 09, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 15, 2019Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: January 24, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
Date: January 24, 2019Other - - Other - Ruling on submitted matter
Date: January 24, 2019Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: February 22, 2019Declaration - Declaration OF LEO LEE IN SUPPORT OF UNDERTAKING BY PERSONAL SURETY
Date: February 26, 2019Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed "R"
Date: February 25, 2019Notice of Related Case
Date: March 05, 2019Request - REQUEST FOR EXEMPTION FROM MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE
Date: March 05, 2019Order - ORDER OF EXEMPTION FROM ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE
Date: March 12, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 22, 2019Notice of Default
Date: March 26, 2019Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal
Date: April 26, 2019Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - AFFIRMED B295920
Date: July 08, 2019Complaint
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Request
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Trial
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (filed by plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Plaintiff's Notice of Lodging of Deposition of Eun Lee
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Plaintiff's Proposed Joint Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Exhibit List (Defendants' Exhibit List)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Defendants' Closing Brief
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Trial; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judg...))
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Other - (ruling re: motion for summary judgment)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Plaintiff's Closing Argument (Reply)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Plaintiff's Trial Brief
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Trial Brief (Defendants' Trial Brief)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Jury Trial / Short-Cause))
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Witness List (Defendants' witness List)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Intention to Move to Vacate Judgment and to Enter New and Different Judgment Per CCP 663
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Plaintiff's Proposed Joint List of Trial Witnesses
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Plaintiff's Proposed Joint List of Trial Exhibits
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Jury Trial / Short-Cause))
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Other - (Plaintiff's Closing Argument (Opening))
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Notice (of Association)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Other - (Ruling on submitted matter)
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA:02/22/19 B295920)
Date: May 03, 2019Other - (Ruling on submitted matter)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for New Trial; Hearing on Motion to Vacate ...))
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Default (NOA:02/22/19 B295920)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Motion re: (to Enter a New and Different Judgment)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (for Notice of Appeal, filed 2/22/19)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Enter A New and Different Judgment Pursuant to CCP 663
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For A New Trial Pursuant to CCP 657
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Request (for exemption from mandatory electronic filing and service)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice (Of Non-Receipt Of Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants Motion)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Motion for New Trial (Per CCP 657)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B295920)
Date: July 08, 2019Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA:02/25/19- R B295920)
Date: May 03, 2019Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal (NOA:02/25/19 -R B295920)
Date: April 26, 2019Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Order (of exemption from electronic filing and service)
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Other - (Tentative ruling re: defendant's motion for attorney's fees)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Default (NOA:2/25/19-R B295920)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("R")
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (for Notice of Appeal, filed 2/25/19, "R")
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Declaration (OF LEO LEE IN SUPPORT OF UNDERTAKING BY PERSONAL SURETY)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Reply (TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL PER CCP 657)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Reply (SUMMARY OF PLAINTIFF'S ARGUMENTS AT MOTION HEARING DATE OF JANUARY 9, 2019)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 03/22/2019)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal (NOA:02/22/19 B295920)
Date: April 26, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.