Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Xerox Financial Services Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hemar Rousso & Heald Llp, against Southern California Family Medical Center, Southern California Medical Center Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mel Red Recana presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 27, 2018 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time59 days |
SUMMONS -
Date: July 27, 2018NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: July 27, 20181. BREACH OF WRITTEN AGREEMENT ;ETC
Date: July 27, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 07, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 10, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: September 24, 2018Complaint
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: September 24, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 10, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 07, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.