Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Rah Eugene, filed a(n) Declaratory Relief Only (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Stevens Law Pc, against Hana Financial Inc., represented by Lim Young S. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Terry Green presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management161 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2018 |
CategoryDeclaratory Relief Only (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time311 days |
SUMMONS -
Date: July 27, 2018NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: July 27, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 03, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: August 14, 2018HANA FINANCIAL, INC.'S ANSWER TO EUGENE RAH'S COMPLAINT
Date: September 12, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: December 13, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: December 14, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: December 26, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: January 04, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: May 13, 2019Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: May 13, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: June 03, 2019Complaint
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: June 03, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.