Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Reyes Edward, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Mehtani Law Offices, against Frimex Hospitality Group Llc, represented by Dykema Gossett Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gregory Keosian presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management474 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2018 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time481 days |
COMPLAINT
Date: July 27, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: July 27, 2018NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: July 27, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 03, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL
Date: August 03, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING -
Date: August 03, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: August 03, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT
Date: August 15, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 20, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING ARBITRATION
Date: August 27, 2018Status Report - Notice STATUS REPORT RE ARBITRATION
Date: February 19, 2019Notice - Notice of Further Status Conference
Date: February 21, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference)
Date: February 20, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 13, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 11/13/2019
Date: November 13, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: November 20, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference) of 11/13/2019)
Date: November 13, 2019Notice (of Further Status Conference)
Date: February 21, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: November 20, 2019Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: November 13, 2019Status Report (RE ARBITRATION)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.