Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Banana Republic Llc A Delaware Limited, The Gap Inc. A Delaware Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Geibelson Michael A. Esq., against Glendale I Mall Associates, represented by Huckins William Warren Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with William F. Fahey presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management101 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2018 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions98 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time370 days |
TRANSFER RECEIPT
Date: August 07, 2018REGISTER OF ACTIONS
Date: August 07, 2018NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: August 07, 2018NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER
Date: August 07, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: August 07, 2018NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 07, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: August 07, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT
Date: August 07, 2018STIPULATION TO TRANSFER ACTION AND ORDER THEREON
Date: August 07, 2018COMPLAINT FOR: 1.BREACH OF CONTRACT;ETC
Date: August 07, 2018PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC, ? 170.6)
Date: August 22, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 12, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 07, 2018EX PARTE ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 17, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 17, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 18, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 25, 2018DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT
Date: October 01, 2018NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT
Date: October 01, 2018DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT
Date: October 01, 2018Other - - Plaintiff's Combined Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer
Date: October 30, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 01, 2018Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: November 01, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 13, 2018Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: November 15, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...)
Date: November 13, 2018Case Management Order
Date: November 16, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: November 16, 2018Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling Re Case Management Conference
Date: November 26, 2018Answer
Date: November 26, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 12, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 12, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S RENEWED MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: March 22, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 29, 2019Separate Statement
Date: March 29, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: March 29, 2019Separate Statement
Date: April 05, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: April 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSI KENNON SWONETZ
Date: April 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF DELIA CUENCA
Date: April 05, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: April 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: April 10, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 11, 2019Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: April 11, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 18, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY
Date: April 18, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 23, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: May 16, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: May 17, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER)
Date: June 04, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: June 05, 2019Answer
Date: June 06, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: June 06, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL
Date: June 13, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 24, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: July 02, 2019Reply - REPLY DECLARATION OF WILLIAM W HUCKINS OM SUPPORT
Date: July 03, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 03, 2019Response - RESPONSE TO OPPOSITION OF THE GAP, INC.
Date: July 03, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 03, 2019Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: July 03, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 08, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF WILLIAM W. HUCKINS
Date: July 08, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE RE DAMAGES PRIOR
Date: July 08, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE RE DURESS
Date: July 08, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES AND ARGUMENT
Date: July 08, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 08, 2019Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER TO BIFURCATE TRIAL
Date: July 08, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY
Date: July 08, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE RE DELAYED DISCOVERY
Date: July 08, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE RE EXPERT TESTIMONY
Date: July 08, 2019Order - ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: July 12, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: July 12, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: July 16, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 17, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO 1
Date: July 17, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: July 17, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 17, 2019Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: July 17, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Date: July 17, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 17, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 25, 2019Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATE, LP'S PRETRIAL REPORT
Date: July 25, 2019Statement of the Case
Date: July 25, 2019Exhibit List
Date: July 25, 2019Jury Instructions
Date: July 25, 2019Witness List
Date: July 25, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 25, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE
Date: July 25, 2019Trial Brief
Date: July 29, 2019Trial Brief
Date: July 30, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL REPORT
Date: July 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 01, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: August 02, 2019Witness List - WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFFS’ AMENDED TRIAL WITNESS LIST
Date: August 06, 2019Notice - NOTICE SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL REPORT
Date: August 06, 2019Trial Brief - TRIAL BRIEF PLAINTIFFS’ SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL REPORT
Date: August 06, 2019Witness List - WITNESS LIST AMENDED WTINESS LIST
Date: August 06, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION RE PLAINTIFFS' MIL NO. 7
Date: August 06, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING RE: CONTINUED FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 06, 2019Exhibit List
Date: August 07, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS
Date: August 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 08, 2019Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: August 12, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: August 08, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: August 12, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (TIIME ESTIMATE: 4-5 DAYS))
Date: August 12, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Incoming Transfer
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Notice (Motion to Strike)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Defendants Demurrer to Plaintiffs Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00of Defendants Demurrer to Plaintiffs Complaint
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Plaintiff's Combined Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...))
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Reply (Brief in Support of Defendant Glendale I Mall Associates, LP's Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter ((Jennifer Sebring, CSR# 13749))
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re Case Management Conference)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Notice (of Defendant's Renewed Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Renewed Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Reply ( in Support of Defendant's Renewed Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Discovery)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Delia Cuenca)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Josi Kennon Swonetz)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Renewed Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' C...))
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Form Interrogatories, Sets One and Three)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Defendant's Requests for Admission, Sets One and Three)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Other - (COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (REDACTED)
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion to Compel Re: Requests for Production; Request for Sanctions)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion to Compel Re: Requests for Admission; Request for Sanctions)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing Date...))
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Deborah Ravel in Support of Plaintiffs' Oppositions to Defendant's Motions to Compel)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Hearing Date on Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeff Stevenson)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Discovery)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion to Compel Re: Form Interrogatories; Request for Sanctions)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Notice (Defendant's Amended Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Josi Kennon Swonetz)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Brief (Plaintiffs' Appendix of Evidence in Support of Their Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Deborah Ravel ISO Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Jamie Onuki, CSR # 13904))
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to De...))
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Its Answer)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Declaration (of William W. Huckins in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Its Answer)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (- Confidential and Highly Confidential Designations)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Stipulation and Protective Order-Confidential ...))
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend its Answer)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Vienna Nguyen, CSR# 13137))
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Answer))
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Separate Statement (in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Objection ( Evidentiary Objections to Declarations in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Adjudication)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Counsel)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs' Separate Statement in Support of Motion for Adjudication)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Opposition ([Plaintiffs?] to Defendant?s Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Portions of Thomas McCarthy's Decla...))
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: April 11, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: April 12, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSI KENNON SWONETZ
Date: April 18, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 12, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFF STEVENSON
Date: April 18, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 18, 2019Separate Statement
Date: April 18, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 24, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 24, 2019Separate Statement
Date: April 24, 2019Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: April 24, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: May 08, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 24, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: June 24, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, AND ARGUMENT
Date: July 08, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE RE CONSEQUENTIAL DAMAGES
Date: July 08, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DUPLICATIVE TESTIMONY
Date: July 08, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Date: July 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))
Date: July 24, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 24, 2019Trial Brief - TRIAL BRIEF PLAINTIFFS’ PRETRIAL REPORT
Date: July 25, 2019Reply (Plaintiffs? Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Objection (to Declarations and Evidence submitted by plaintiffs in opposition)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Response (to Opposition of the Gap, Inc.)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Reply (Declaration of William W Huckins om Support)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Declaration (of William W. Huckins)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motions in Limine)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (to Exclude Evidence, Testimony, and Argument)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication on behalf of Plain...))
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Re Delayed Discovery)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Re Duress)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Re Damages Prior)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Re Expert Testimony)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Re Consequential Damages)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Duplicative Testimony)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Re Negotiation of Co-Tenancy Provision)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Re Direct Billing Arrangements With Other Trash Haulers)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (to Exclude Testimony)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Motion for Order (to Bifurcate Trial)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (to Exclude References and Argument)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (to Exclude Documents and Testimony Not Produced During Discovery)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Order (on Motions for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 07/12/2019 and Orders)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/17/2019)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs' Motion in limine No 1)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Opposition ( To Defendant?s Motion In Limine #8 To Exclude Evidence Of Consequential Damages)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Settlement Conference Statement)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Opposition ( To Motion In Limine #12 To Exclude Duplicative Or Cumulative Testimony)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Opposition ( To Defendant?s Motion In Limine #10 To Exclude Evidence Of Economic Duress)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/17/2019)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (OF CONFIDENTIAL MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Settlement Conference)
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice ( OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice (Defendant Glendale I Mall Associates LP Proposed Voir Dire Questions for the Court)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Trial Brief (PLAINTIFFS? PRETRIAL REPORT)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice (DEFENDANT GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATE, LP'S PRETRIAL REPORT)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendant's Proposed Jury Instructions)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendant's Proposed Trial Exhibits)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time))
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Notice (of Errata Re: Plaintiffs' Supplemental Pretrial Report)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Notice (Second Supplemental Pretrial Report)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Re: Continued Final Status Conference)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition re Plaintiffs' MIL No. 7)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Witness List (AMENDED WTINESS LIST)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Wil S. Wilcox, CSR# 9178)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Witness List (PLAINTIFFS? AMENDED TRIAL WITNESS LIST)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Trial Brief (PLAINTIFFS? SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL REPORT)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Tiime estimate: 4-5 days)))
Date: August 12, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: August 12, 2019Notice of Lodging (Deposition Transcripts)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: August 12, 2019Request for Dismissal ((With prejudice, entire action, each party to bear its own fees and costs))
Date: September 11, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.