Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Williams Elizabeth E., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mikhov Steve Borislav, against American Honda Motor Co. Inc., represented by Tran Trang Thi, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Lia Martin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 17, 2018 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time205 days |
Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: October 24, 2018Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: November 02, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 12, 2018Notice of Settlement (of entire case)
Date: October 30, 2018Notice (Of OSC Re: Dismissal)
Date: November 13, 2018Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: March 26, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: February 07, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.