Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Molina Jose, Silva Ruth, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Sabzevar Farzad Michael Esq., against Kamran Staffing Inc., Logistic Team Shipping Centers, represented by Guerra Jason Eric, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 17, 2018 |
CategoryPremises Liability (E.G.Slip & Fall) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions549 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time549 days |
SUMMONS -
Date: July 17, 2018COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: July 17, 2018NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: July 17, 2018Answer
Date: January 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: December 31, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 01/17/2020
Date: January 17, 2020Order - Dismissal
Date: January 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: January 17, 2020Certificate of Mailing for ((Jury Trial) of 01/17/2020)
Date: January 17, 2020Answer
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: December 31, 2019Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: January 17, 2020Order - Dismissal
Date: January 17, 2020Complaint
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.