Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lamden David, Tutone Sal, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Obagi Zein E Jr, against Awazar Esam, Keller Williams Realty Inc. Dba Keller William Beverly Hills Realty, Tutone Sal, represented by Behesnilian Daniel V, Spile Steven Dana Esq, Belsheim Shannon Elisabeth, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management126 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 11, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions23 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time553 days |
COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION
Date: July 11, 2018NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: July 11, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: July 11, 2018PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., SECTION 170.6).
Date: July 13, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 18, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 25, 2018AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: July 20, 2018NOTICE OF COURT'S GRANT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE
Date: July 30, 2018NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -
Date: August 07, 2018ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: August 28, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 17, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 01, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 18, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 25, 2018Case Management Order
Date: November 14, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: November 14, 2018Answer
Date: November 26, 2018Notice - Notice of Final Status Conference and Trial Setting
Date: December 06, 2018Notice - Notice of Unavailability
Date: February 04, 2019Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: April 22, 2019Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
Date: May 20, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: June 06, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT)
Date: July 22, 2019Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT 1ST
Date: July 22, 2019Order - ORDER RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 22, 2019Informal Discovery Conference
Date: July 23, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 24, 2019Informal Discovery Conference
Date: August 05, 2019Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: August 14, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: September 04, 2019Answer
Date: September 04, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: September 18, 2019Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: September 18, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: November 08, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: November 21, 2019Order - ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: November 26, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: December 12, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: January 15, 2020Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: January 24, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF HEE J. KIM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 24, 2020Order re Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Sal Tutone (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Sal Tutone (Defendant); As to: David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Order to continue trial date; Filed by: Sal Tutone (Defendant); As to: David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Conference Date Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Sal Tutone (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Motion to Enforce Settlement; Filed by: David Lamden (Plaintiff); As to: Sal Tutone (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Declaration of Hee J. Kim in Support of Motion; Filed by: David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: FORWARD BEVERLY HILLS, INC. DBA KELLER (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Sal Tutone (Cross-Complainant); As to: Sal Tutone (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Complaint Filed by David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Sal Tutone (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Sal Tutone (Defendant); As to: Keller Williams Realty, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: David Lamden (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by Sal Tutone (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial date)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by Sal Tutone (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Complaint (1st) Filed by David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Notice (of Final Status Conference and Trial Setting) Filed by David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Answer Filed by Sal Tutone (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Sal Tutone (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by FORWARD BEVERLY HILLS, INC. DBA KELLER (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by FORWARD BEVERLY HILLS, INC. DBA KELLER (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to continue trial date) Filed by Sal Tutone (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Sal Tutone (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Informal Discovery Confe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability) Filed by FORWARD BEVERLY HILLS, INC. DBA KELLER (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Conference Date Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Sal Tutone (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Hee J. Kim in Support of Motion) Filed by David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Order (re Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed by David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Motion to Enforce Settlement Filed by David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by David Lamden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Order (to continue trial date) Filed by Sal Tutone (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Notice (of Final Status Conference and Trial Setting)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order re Determination of Good Faith Settlement)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (for Leave of Court to File First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint))
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Conference Date
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Order (re Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Notice ( of Court Order re: Keller Williams Settlement to Be in Good Faith)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Order (to continue trial date)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/24/2019)
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to continue trial date)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial date))
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Informal Discovery Confe...))
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Hee J. Kim in Support of Motion)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.