Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kincaid Valerie Ruth, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Shomer Ivan, Starr Robert L. Esq., against American Honda Motor Co. Inc., Boeckmann Automotive Llc, Galpin Honda, represented by Hairapetian Armen Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gregory W. Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory W. Alarcon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management117 days |
Filing DateJuly 11, 2018 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time272 days |
COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY ;ETC
Date: July 11, 2018NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: July 11, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS
Date: July 27, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 31, 2018CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE GREGORY ALARCON IN DEPARTMENT 36 FOR ALL PURPOSES
Date: August 22, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 23, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 15, 2018Answer
Date: October 17, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 19, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: November 05, 2018Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: October 19, 2018Request for Dismissal (with prej, entire action)
Date: April 09, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: November 05, 2018Answer
Date: October 17, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.