Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alvarez Jose, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Dominguez Herbert, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 09, 2018 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time319 days |
COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY (1) NEGLIGENCE ;ETC
Date: July 09, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: July 09, 2018NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: July 09, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: November 30, 2018Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: January 02, 2019Notice of Related Case
Date: January 28, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: May 24, 2019Complaint
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: January 28, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: November 30, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: May 24, 2019Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: January 02, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.